Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Echeverry, Karen, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Krakower, Evan, against Howard, Michael R, represented by Liss, Jonathan G, Esq., in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Robinson, Michael A. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 17, 2018 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is filed by Karen Echeverry against Michael R. Howard in the Circuit Court of the 17th Judicial Circuit in Broward County, Florida. The complaint seeks damages in an amount exceeding $15,000. Karen Echeverry is a resident and citizen o...
Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 17, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 17, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: February 06, 2018Request for Production
Date: March 05, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: March 05, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: February 28, 2018Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: March 09, 2018Response to Request for Admissions
Date: March 20, 2018Request for Compulsory Physical Examination
Date: March 14, 2018Notice of Service
Date: March 05, 2018Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: May 21, 2018Re-Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: May 16, 2018Order Extending Time
Date: May 21, 2018Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: May 30, 2018Supplemental Response - Request for Production
Date: June 04, 2018Request for Copies
Date: August 23, 2018Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: September 24, 2018Re-Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: July 26, 2018Supplemental Interrogatories
Date: August 27, 2018Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories
Date: October 10, 2018Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel
Date: November 28, 2018Notice of Compliance
Date: October 24, 2018Notice of Mediation
Date: October 31, 2018Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: December 11, 2018Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: November 30, 2018Notice of Supplemental Interrogs
Date: December 19, 2018Request to Produce
Date: December 19, 2018Order for Substitution of Counsel
Date: November 29, 2018Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement
Date: December 12, 2018Certificate of No Objection
Date: January 02, 2019Notice of Mediation
Date: January 24, 2019Motion
Date: February 19, 2019Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: January 28, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: March 11, 2019Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: March 13, 2019Notice of Service of Expert Interrogatories
Date: March 15, 2019Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement
Date: March 22, 2019Certificate
Date: March 18, 2019Mediation Report
Date: March 20, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: May 13, 2019Certificate of No Objection
Date: March 29, 2019Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: April 02, 2019Motion
Date: April 10, 2019Order Granting Motion
Date: April 22, 2019eSummons Issuance
Date: January 17, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: February 09, 2018Request for Production
Date: February 09, 2018Interrogatories & Notice of Filing
Date: February 09, 2018Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: February 09, 2018Notice
Date: February 09, 2018Request for Compulsory Physical Examination
Date: March 22, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: March 30, 2018Response to Request for Admissions
Date: May 21, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: May 21, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: May 24, 2018Answer to Interrogs
Date: June 11, 2018Request for Copies
Date: October 18, 2018Order Setting
Date: October 22, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: January 07, 2019Certificate
Date: January 07, 2019Response to Request for Production
Date: January 08, 2019Re-Notice of Mediation
Date: January 25, 2019Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: January 29, 2019Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: February 01, 2019Witness List
Date: February 04, 2019Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: February 05, 2019Expert Witness List
Date: February 06, 2019Motion to Compel
Date: February 11, 2019Certificate of No Objection
Date: February 15, 2019Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: February 19, 2019Order Compelling Discovery
Date: February 19, 2019Response to Request for Production
Date: February 20, 2019Answer to Supplemental Interrogatories
Date: February 20, 2019Certificate of No Objection
Date: February 20, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: February 21, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: February 23, 2019Witness List
Date: March 04, 2019Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: March 04, 2019Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: March 06, 2019Order to Show Cause
Date: March 06, 2019Certificate of No Objection
Date: March 07, 2019Motion
Date: March 12, 2019Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement
Date: March 20, 2019Motion
Date: April 08, 2019Motion
Date: April 08, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: April 10, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: April 16, 2019Order Granting Motion
Date: April 22, 2019Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: April 23, 2019Witness List
Date: May 01, 2019Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: May 07, 2019Request to Produce
Date: May 08, 2019Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: May 08, 2019Motion for Protective Order
Date: May 13, 2019Motion
Date: May 13, 2019Order
Date: May 15, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: May 15, 2019Order
Date: May 20, 2019Order Resetting
Date: May 21, 2019Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: May 21, 2019Motion to Compel
Date: May 21, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: May 23, 2019Notice
Date: May 31, 2019Motion
Date: June 19, 2019Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories
Date: June 24, 2019Ex Parte Order
Date: June 25, 2019Motion to Compel
Date: June 25, 2019Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: July 03, 2019Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories
Date: June 26, 2019Notice of Expert Witnesses
Date: July 09, 2019Stipulation
Date: October 02, 2019Notice of Conflict
Date: January 21, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
Stipulation for Final Order of Dismissal |
|
July 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Expert Witnesses OF ADOPTING PREVIOUSLY FILEDParty: Defendant Howard, Michael R |
|
July 03, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition | |
June 26, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories | |
June 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Order COMPELLING EXPERT DISCOVERY RESPONSES: Granted |
|
June 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel Party: Defendant Howard, Michael R |
|
June 24, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories | |
June 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion TO COMPELParty: Defendant Howard, Michael R |
|
May 31, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice OF ADOPTING PREVIOUSLY FILED WITNESS LISTParty: Defendant Howard, Michael R |
|
May 23, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.