Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Gomes, Jason, Gonzalez, David, filed a(n) Discrimination - Labor and Employment case represented by Gitkin, James, against Roman, Daniela, Roman Gastro Inc, represented by Farrow, Jay L, Esq., in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Phillips, Carol-Lisa presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 17, 2018 |
CategoryOther - Discrimination Employment Or Other |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeDiscrimination |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is filed by Jason Gomes and David Gonzalez against Roman Gastro, Inc. d/b/a Wunderbar Sportsbar & Grill and Daniela Roman. The plaintiffs allege that they were wrongfully terminated from their employment at Wunderbar due to their sexua...
Notice of Appearance
Date: February 09, 2018Motion to Dismiss
Date: February 26, 2018Order Granting Motion
Date: April 04, 2018Circuit - Notice LOP Order to Show Cause Notice of Hearing
Date: February 23, 2019eSummons Issuance
Date: January 17, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 17, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 17, 2018Summons Returned Unserved
Date: February 06, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 17, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: February 06, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: February 09, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: March 05, 2018Reply
Date: March 28, 2018Response to Motion to Dismiss
Date: March 28, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 23, 2019 | Docket Event | Circuit - Notice LOP Order to Show Cause Notice of Hearing | |
April 04, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Motion TO DISMISS |
|
March 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
Reply Party: Defendant Roman Gastro Inc Defendant Roman, Daniela |
|
March 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Response to Motion to Dismiss | |
March 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
February 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss Party: Defendant Roman Gastro Inc Defendant Roman, Daniela |
|
February 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance Party: Defendant Roman Gastro Inc Defendant Roman, Daniela |
|
February 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time Party: Defendant Roman Gastro Inc Defendant Roman, Daniela |
|
February 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Unserved Party: Defendant Roman, Daniela |
|
February 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 25th day of January, 2018Party: Defendant Roman Gastro Inc |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.