Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Water Damage Clean Llc, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Levy, Harold, Esq., against St Johns Insurance Company Inc, represented by Smith, Michelle Lambert, Esq., Smith, Michelle L, Esq., in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Frink, Keathan B. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 17, 2018 |
CategoryOther - Insurance Claim |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is a petition for declaratory relief filed by Water Damage Clean, LLC on behalf of Richard Kagan and Stacy Kagan against St. Johns Insurance Company, Inc. The complaint alleges that the insured property, located at 7800 NW 120" Drive, ...
Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: January 17, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 17, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: January 17, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: May 08, 2018Reply to Affirmative Defenses
Date: March 05, 2018Response to Request for Admissions
Date: May 08, 2018Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: May 08, 2018Request for Production
Date: May 08, 2018Cross Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: May 21, 2018Notice of Readiness for Trial
Date: May 09, 2018Cross Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: June 28, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: May 10, 2018Motion to Transfer & Consolidate
Date: July 02, 2018Cross Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: May 22, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: June 07, 2018Motion to Compel
Date: June 05, 2018Ex Parte Motion
Date: July 05, 2018Motion for Protective Order
Date: June 25, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: July 11, 2018Motion for Protective Order
Date: July 05, 2018Motion to Compel/Impose Sanctions
Date: September 12, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: July 23, 2018Response to Request for Admissions
Date: September 12, 2018Motion to Compel Discovery
Date: September 12, 2018Notice of Cancellation
Date: August 08, 2018Motion
Date: September 12, 2018Motion for Summary Final Judgment
Date: November 08, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: December 21, 2018Notice of Cancellation
Date: February 23, 2019eSummons Issuance
Date: January 17, 2018Request for Production of Documents
Date: January 17, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 17, 2018Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: February 12, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: April 23, 2018Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: May 08, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: June 25, 2018Privilege Log
Date: September 12, 2018Notice of Withdrawal
Date: September 20, 2018Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: August 07, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: August 07, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 23, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
December 21, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
November 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Summary Final Judgment AND INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM OF LAWParty: Plaintiff Water Damage Clean LLC |
|
September 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Withdrawal | |
September 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Withdrawal | |
September 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel/Impose Sanctions Party: Plaintiff Water Damage Clean LLC |
|
September 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Admissions | |
September 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel Discovery Party: Plaintiff Water Damage Clean LLC |
|
September 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion Party: Plaintiff Water Damage Clean LLC |
|
September 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Privilege Log |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.