Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
New Penn Financial Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Cobb, William F, against Bank Of America Na, Clerk Of Court Broward County Florida, Da Rosa, Ivanir, Oakland Shores Condominium 1 Inc, represented by Arias, Andrew, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Gundersen, Andrea Ruth presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 17, 2018 |
CategoryReal Prop Non-Homestead Res Fore - >$50K - <$250,000 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is a foreclosure action filed by New Penn Financial, LLC d/b/a Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing against Ivanir Da Rosa and other defendants in Broward County, Florida. The plaintiff alleges that Ivanir Da Rosa executed a promissory note a...
eSummons Issuance
Date: January 17, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 17, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 17, 2018Notice of Filing
Date: January 17, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 17, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: March 01, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: March 02, 2018Notice of Lis Pendens
Date: January 17, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: February 06, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: February 06, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: March 01, 2018Answer to Complaint
Date: January 22, 2018Answer
Date: February 13, 2018Motion for Default & Default
Date: April 02, 2018Notice of Filing
Date: May 04, 2018Final Disposition Form
Date: June 11, 2018Notice of Sale - Issued by Attorney
Date: June 21, 2018Bid Sheet
Date: July 18, 2018Notice of Filing
Date: July 23, 2018Certificate of Sale
Date: July 18, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 17, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 17, 2018Value Claim Form
Date: January 17, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 17, 2018Answer to Complaint
Date: January 30, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: March 01, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: March 01, 2018Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: May 04, 2018Notice of Filing
Date: April 02, 2018Notice of Filing
Date: May 08, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: May 11, 2018Not of Filing Original Note & Mortgage
Date: June 11, 2018Certificate of Mailing
Date: June 13, 2018Proof of Publication
Date: July 06, 2018Certificate of Title
Date: July 31, 2018Certificate of Disbursements
Date: August 06, 2018Affidavit
Date: April 02, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Certificate of Title & Certificate of Disbursement Emailed | |
October 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Certificate of Title & Certificate of Disbursement Mailed | |
August 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
Check Paid TO BROCK & SCOTT PLLC TRUST ACCOUNT PER CERT ($80,100.00) MAILED |
|
August 06, 2018 | Docket Event | Certificate of Disbursements | |
July 31, 2018 | Docket Event | Certificate of Title | |
July 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
Comment: FILE CREATED FOR ORGINAL DOCS |
|
July 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing COPY OF PPUB AND CERTIFICATE OF SALEParty: Plaintiff New Penn Financial LLC |
|
July 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Foreclosure Clerk's Fee Payor: David Naharin ; Userid: CTS- ; Receipt: 20181RA1A003119; ;Amount: $1,209.00 |
|
July 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Foreclosure Bid Payor: David Naharin ; Userid: CTS- ; Receipt: 20181RA1A003119; ;Amount: $80,100.00 |
|
July 18, 2018 | Docket Event | Bid Sheet |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.