Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Acosta, Esperanza, Acosta, Henry, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Low, David, Esq., against St Johns Insurance Company Inc, represented by Thomas, Mary Bonanno, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Phillips, Carol-Lisa presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 17, 2018 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is filed by Henry Acosta and Esperanza Acosta against St. Johns Insurance Company, Inc. The plaintiffs allege that they owned and resided in a dwelling in Broward County, Florida, which was insured by a policy issued by the defendant. ...
Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: January 17, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: January 17, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 17, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 17, 2018Request for Production
Date: January 17, 2018Response to Request for Admissions
Date: February 12, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: January 31, 2018Answer to Complaint
Date: February 12, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: March 10, 2018Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: March 10, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: March 13, 2018Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: March 20, 2018Notice of Settlement
Date: August 01, 2018Motion for Mediation
Date: June 20, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 17, 2018Notice
Date: January 30, 2018Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: January 31, 2018Request to Produce
Date: February 12, 2018Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: February 12, 2018Request
Date: February 20, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: March 05, 2018Privilege Log
Date: March 10, 2018Notice of Settlement
Date: August 01, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Settlement Party: Plaintiff Acosta, Henry Plaintiff Acosta, Esperanza |
|
August 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Settlement Party: Plaintiff Acosta, Esperanza Plaintiff Acosta, Henry |
|
June 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Mediation Party: Plaintiff Acosta, Henry Plaintiff Acosta, Esperanza |
|
June 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Mediation Party: Plaintiff Acosta, Esperanza Plaintiff Acosta, Henry |
|
March 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories | |
March 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time Party: Plaintiff Acosta, Henry Plaintiff Acosta, Esperanza |
|
March 10, 2018 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Production | |
March 10, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories | |
March 10, 2018 | Docket Event | Privilege Log | |
March 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.