Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
New Penn Financial Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Vanslette, Jason Michael, against Courts At Woodland Homeowners' Association Inc, State Of Florida, Williams, Tonya, represented by Dunn, Mark S, Valancy, Steven S, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Gundersen, Andrea Ruth presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 17, 2018 |
CategoryReal Prop Homestead Res Fore - >$50K - <$250,000 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is a legal action filed by New Penn Financial LLC, doing business as Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing, against Tonya Williams, her unknown spouse, and other parties. The purpose of the action is to foreclose a mortgage on a property locat...
Value Claim Form
Date: January 17, 2018Notice of Lis Pendens
Date: January 17, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 17, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 17, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 17, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 17, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 17, 2018Summons Returned Unserved
Date: January 24, 2018Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: March 19, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: January 24, 2018Answer
Date: January 31, 2018Notice of Filing
Date: March 27, 2018Summons Returned Unserved
Date: January 24, 2018Motion for Default
Date: March 05, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: March 15, 2018Notice of Filing
Date: March 20, 2018Order Vacating Default
Date: March 20, 2018Proof of Publication
Date: May 15, 2018Notice of Filing
Date: March 28, 2018Final Disposition Form
Date: April 16, 2018Affidavit of Attorney Fees
Date: March 26, 2018Notice of Sale - Issued by Attorney
Date: July 23, 2018Order Cancelling Foreclosure Sale
Date: August 15, 2018Notice of Sale - Issued by Attorney
Date: August 16, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 17, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 17, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 17, 2018Response
Date: January 23, 2018Summons Returned Unserved
Date: January 24, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: January 24, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: January 24, 2018Default
Date: March 05, 2018Notice of Dropping Parties- Generic
Date: March 05, 2018Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: March 15, 2018Stipulation
Date: March 19, 2018Answer
Date: March 19, 2018Motion to Cancel Foreclosure Sale
Date: July 12, 2018Ord Canceling/Rescheduling Clerk's Fclsre Sale
Date: July 16, 2018Notice of Sale - Issued by Attorney
Date: April 30, 2018Proof of Publication
Date: August 07, 2018Emergency Motion
Date: August 15, 2018Proof of Publication
Date: September 11, 2018Motion to Vacate Final Judgment
Date: September 04, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: September 18, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 16, 2018 | Hearing |
Foreclosure Sale Per Order |
|
September 18, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
September 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proof of Publication October 16, 2018 |
|
September 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Re-open Fee Payor: REENA SANDERS ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A122348; ;Amount: $50.00 |
|
September 04, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion to Vacate Final Judgment Party: Plaintiff New Penn Financial LLC |
|
August 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
Electronic Sale Fee Paid Payor: REENA SANDERS ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A115971; ;Amount: $60.00 |
|
August 21, 2018 | Hearing |
Foreclosure Sale Per Order |
|
August 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Sale - Issued by Attorney October 16, 2018 |
|
August 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order Cancelling Foreclosure Sale granted reset 10-16-2018 |
|
August 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
Emergency Motion to cancel foreclosure saleParty: Defendant Williams, Tonya |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.