Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Raymond Audain, et al Plaintiff vs. Florida Peninsula Insurance Company Defendant
On January 17, 2018 an other - insurance claim case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL. Judge Bidwill, Martin J. presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 17, 2018
Last Refreshed
September 17, 2023
Filing Location
Broward County, FL
Filing Court House
Central Courthouse
Category
Other - Insurance Claim
Practice Area
Insurance
Matter Type
Insurance Coverage
Status
Settlement
Overview
Causes of Action
COUNT I— BREACH OF CONTRACT
COUNT I PETITION FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint is filed by Raymond Audain and Michelle Audain against Florida Peninsula Insurance Company. The plaintiffs allege that during the policy period, their property was damaged, resulting in damage to the building, contents, and loss of…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
Order Resetting
Date: Apr 12, 2019Notice of Settlement
Date: Mar 29, 2019Notice of Settlement
Date: Mar 29, 2019Motion to be Excused from Trial Docket
Date: Mar 21, 2019Motion in Limine
Date: Mar 19, 2019Witness List
Date: Mar 08, 2019Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: Feb 26, 2019Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: Jan 30, 2019Certificate of Compliance With Mandatory Disclosure
Date: Jan 02, 2019Certificate of Compliance With Mandatory Disclosure
Date: Dec 18, 2018Notice of Cancellation
Date: Dec 18, 2018Notice of Cancellation
Date: Dec 17, 2018Order Resetting
Date: Dec 15, 2018Exhibit List
Date: Dec 13, 2018Joint Pre-Trial Stipulation
Date: Dec 13, 2018Joint Pre-Trial Stipulation
Date: Dec 13, 2018Disclosure of Expert Witness
Date: Dec 12, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: Dec 06, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: Dec 05, 2018Objection to Non-Party Production
Date: Dec 05, 2018Certificate of Compliance With Mandatory Disclosure
Date: Dec 04, 2018Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: Dec 04, 2018Motion to Strike
Date: Nov 30, 2018Re-Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: Nov 28, 2018Supplemental Response - Request for Production
Date: Nov 28, 2018Supplemental Response - Request for Production
Date: Nov 28, 2018Re-Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: Nov 19, 2018Re-Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: Nov 13, 2018Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: Nov 13, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: Nov 09, 2018Objection
Date: Nov 02, 2018Objection
Date: Nov 01, 2018Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: Nov 01, 2018Motion to Compel
Date: Oct 09, 2018Mediation Report
Date: Sep 26, 2018Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement
Date: Sep 21, 2018Notice of Cancellation
Date: Sep 13, 2018Certificate
Date: Sep 13, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: Sep 12, 2018Order for Substitution of Counsel
Date: Sep 12, 2018Objection
Date: Sep 12, 2018Notice of Mediation
Date: Sep 10, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: Sep 07, 2018Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: Sep 07, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: Sep 07, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: Sep 07, 2018Re-Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: Sep 06, 2018Order Resetting
Date: Aug 31, 2018Response to Request to Produce
Date: Aug 31, 2018Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: Aug 31, 2018Order Granting Motion for Continuance
Date: Aug 30, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: Aug 29, 2018Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel
Date: Aug 24, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: Aug 23, 2018Motion for Leave
Date: Aug 22, 2018Agreed Order
Date: Aug 21, 2018Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel
Date: Aug 20, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: Aug 02, 2018Disclosure of Expert Witness
Date: Jul 03, 2018Disclosure of Expert Witness
Date: Jul 02, 2018Notice
Date: Jun 26, 2018Certificate of Compliance
Date: Jun 25, 2018Certificate
Date: Jun 25, 2018Motion to Compel
Date: Jun 20, 2018Response to Request for Admissions
Date: Jun 11, 2018Request for Production
Date: Jun 05, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: Jun 05, 2018Notice of Service of Expert Interrogatories
Date: Jun 05, 2018Request for Production
Date: Jun 05, 2018Notice of Mediation
Date: May 21, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: Apr 30, 2018Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories
Date: Apr 30, 2018Reply to Answer
Date: Apr 27, 2018Amended Answer Affirmative Defenses
Date: Apr 27, 2018Order Setting
Date: Apr 27, 2018Notice
Date: Apr 27, 2018Agreed Order
Date: Apr 16, 2018Notice of Cancellation
Date: Apr 13, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: Apr 09, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: Apr 09, 2018Response to Request to Produce
Date: Mar 26, 2018Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: Mar 26, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: Mar 13, 2018Request for Production
Date: Mar 09, 2018Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: Mar 09, 2018Motion to Strike Affirmative Defenses
Date: Mar 08, 2018Notice of Cancellation
Date: Mar 08, 2018Reply to Answer
Date: Mar 07, 2018Answer Affirmative Defenses
Date: Mar 07, 2018Reply to Answer
Date: Mar 07, 2018Amended Complaint
Date: Feb 27, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: Feb 27, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: Feb 23, 2018Request for Production
Date: Jan 17, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: Jan 17, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: Jan 17, 2018Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: Jan 17, 2018Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: Jan 17, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: Jan 17, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: Jan 17, 2018Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order Resetting Calendar Call 05-17-2019 |
|
March 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Settlement Party: Plaintiff Audain, Raymond Plaintiff Audrain, Michelle |
|
March 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Settlement Party: Plaintiff Audrain, Michelle Plaintiff Audain, Raymond |
|
March 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion to be Excused from Trial Docket A PORTION OF THE TRIALParty: Defendant Florida Peninsula Insurance Company |
|
March 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine toLimit or Exclude Testimony and to Exclude Certain ExhibitsParty: Defendant Florida Peninsula Insurance Company |
|
March 08, 2019 | Docket Event | Witness List | |
February 26, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Interrogs | |
January 30, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum | |
January 02, 2019 | Docket Event | Certificate of Compliance With Mandatory Disclosure | |
December 18, 2018 | Docket Event | Certificate of Compliance With Mandatory Disclosure | |
December 18, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
December 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
December 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order Resetting Calendar Call 03-22-2019 |
|
December 13, 2018 | Docket Event | Exhibit List | |
December 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Joint Pre-Trial Stipulation Party: Plaintiff Audain, Raymond Plaintiff Audrain, Michelle |
|
December 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Joint Pre-Trial Stipulation Party: Plaintiff Audrain, Michelle Plaintiff Audain, Raymond |
|
December 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Disclosure of Expert Witness | |
December 06, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
December 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
December 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Objection to Non-Party Production | |
December 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Objection to Non-Party Production | |
December 04, 2018 | Docket Event | Certificate of Compliance With Mandatory Disclosure | |
December 04, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Production From Non-Party | |
December 04, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Production From Non-Party | |
November 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion to Strike Party: Defendant Florida Peninsula Insurance Company |
|
November 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Re-Notice of Taking Deposition | |
November 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
Supplemental Response - Request for Production Party: Plaintiff Audain, Raymond Plaintiff Audrain, Michelle |
|
November 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
Supplemental Response - Request for Production Party: Plaintiff Audrain, Michelle Plaintiff Audain, Raymond |
|
November 19, 2018 | Docket Event | Re-Notice of Taking Deposition | |
November 13, 2018 | Docket Event | Re-Notice of Taking Deposition | |
November 13, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories | |
November 09, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum | |
November 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Objection TO DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF INTENT TO SERVE SUBPOENA(S) FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS WITHOUT DEPOSITIONParty: Plaintiff Audain, Raymond Plaintiff Audrain, Michelle |
|
November 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
Objection TO DEFENDANT'S SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM WITHOUT DEPOSITIONParty: Plaintiff Audain, Raymond Plaintiff Audrain, Michelle |
|
November 01, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Production From Non-Party | |
November 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
Objection TO DEFENDANT'S SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM WITHOUT DEPOSITIONParty: Plaintiff Audrain, Michelle Plaintiff Audain, Raymond |
|
October 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel Party: Defendant Florida Peninsula Insurance Company |
|
September 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Mediation Report | |
September 21, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement | |
September 21, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement | |
September 13, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
September 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Certificate OF APPEARANCE AND AUTHORITY FOR DEFENDANTParty: Defendant Florida Peninsula Insurance Company |
|
September 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition | |
September 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Order for Substitution of Counsel | |
September 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Objection TO THE DUCES TECUM OF PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF DEFENDANT'S CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVE WITHTHE MOST KNOWLEDGE PURSUANT TO RULE 1.310(b)(6Party: Defendant Florida Peninsula Insurance Company |
|
September 10, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Mediation | |
September 07, 2018 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Production | |
September 07, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories | |
September 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum RAYMOND AUDAIN & MICHELLE AUDAIN. October 31,2018 at 9:30 a.m |
|
September 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Taking Deposition RAYMOND & MICHELLE AUDAIN. October 31,2018 at 9:30 a.m |
|
September 06, 2018 | Docket Event | Re-Notice of Taking Deposition | |
August 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order Resetting Trial 12-14-2018 9:30 AM |
|
August 31, 2018 | Docket Event | Response to Request to Produce | |
August 31, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories | |
August 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Motion for Continuance reset to 01/07/19 trial docket |
|
August 29, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum | |
August 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel Hailey A. Goldman, Esq. Florida Bar No.: 144071Party: Defendant Florida Peninsula Insurance Company |
|
August 23, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
August 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Leave Party: Defendant Florida Peninsula Insurance Company |
|
August 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
Agreed Order APPROVING STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL |
|
August 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel Hailey A. Goldman, Esq. Florida Bar No.: 144071Party: Defendant Florida Peninsula Insurance Company |
|
August 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance Party: Defendant Florida Peninsula Insurance Company |
|
July 03, 2018 | Docket Event | Disclosure of Expert Witness | |
July 02, 2018 | Docket Event | Disclosure of Expert Witness | |
June 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice OF ENTERING UPON LANDParty: Defendant Florida Peninsula Insurance Company |
|
June 25, 2018 | Docket Event | Certificate of Compliance | |
June 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
Certificate OF APPEARANCE AND AUTHORITYParty: Defendant Florida Peninsula Insurance Company |
|
June 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel INSPECTIONParty: Defendant Florida Peninsula Insurance Company |
|
June 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Response to Request for Admissions TO PLAINTIFF'SParty: Defendant Florida Peninsula Insurance Company |
|
June 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request for Production EXPERT WITNESSParty: Plaintiff Audain, Raymond Plaintiff Audrain, Michelle |
|
June 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request for Admissions Party: Plaintiff Audain, Raymond Plaintiff Audrain, Michelle |
|
June 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Service of Expert Interrogatories Party: Plaintiff Audain, Raymond Plaintiff Audrain, Michelle |
|
June 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request for Production EXPERT WITNESSParty: Plaintiff Audrain, Michelle Plaintiff Audain, Raymond |
|
May 21, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Mediation | |
April 30, 2018 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Production | |
April 30, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories | |
April 27, 2018 | Docket Event | Reply to Answer | |
April 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
Amended Answer & Affirmative Defenses Party: Defendant Florida Peninsula Insurance Company |
|
April 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Calendar Call 09-21-2018 |
|
April 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice TO SET CAUSE FOR JURY TRIALParty: Plaintiff Audain, Raymond Plaintiff Audrain, Michelle |
|
April 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice TO SET CAUSE FOR JURY TRIALParty: Plaintiff Audrain, Michelle Plaintiff Audain, Raymond |
|
April 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Agreed Order ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; DENIED IN PART (SEE ORDER) |
|
April 13, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
April 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time Party: Plaintiff Audain, Raymond Plaintiff Audrain, Michelle |
|
April 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time Party: Plaintiff Audrain, Michelle Plaintiff Audain, Raymond |
|
March 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Response to Request to Produce | |
March 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories | |
March 13, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
March 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request for Production Party: Defendant Florida Peninsula Insurance Company |
|
March 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Service of Interrogs Party: Defendant Florida Peninsula Insurance Company |
|
March 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion to Strike Affirmative Defenses Party: Plaintiff Audain, Raymond Plaintiff Audrain, Michelle |
|
March 08, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
March 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Reply to Answer Party: Plaintiff Audain, Raymond Plaintiff Audrain, Michelle |
|
March 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Answer & Affirmative Defenses Party: Defendant Florida Peninsula Insurance Company |
|
March 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Reply to Answer Party: Plaintiff Audrain, Michelle Plaintiff Audain, Raymond |
|
February 27, 2018 | Docket Event | Amended Complaint | |
February 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance Garrett S. Elsinger, Esq. Florida Bar No: 91022Party: Plaintiff Audain, Raymond Plaintiff Audrain, Michelle |
|
February 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance Garrett S. Elsinger, Esq. Florida Bar No: 91022Party: Plaintiff Audrain, Michelle Plaintiff Audain, Raymond |
|
February 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance HAILEY GOLDMAN, ESQ. Florida Bar Number: 144071Party: Defendant Florida Peninsula Insurance Company |
|
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request for Production TO FLORIDA PENINSULA INSURANCE COMPANYParty: Plaintiff Audain, Raymond Plaintiff Audrain, Michelle |
|
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Complaint (eFiled) Party: Plaintiff Audain, Raymond Plaintiff Audrain, Michelle |
|
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance FLORIDA PENINSULA INSURANCE COMPANY |
|
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Service of Interrogs TO FLORIDA PENINSULA INSURANCE COMPANYParty: Plaintiff Audain, Raymond Plaintiff Audrain, Michelle |
|
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses JOHN A. SALCEDOParty: Plaintiff Audain, Raymond Plaintiff Audrain, Michelle |
|
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum OF DEFENDANT'S DESIGNATED CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVE(S) WITH THE MOST KNOWLEDGE PURSUANT TO RULE 1.30(b)(6)Party: Plaintiff Audain, Raymond Plaintiff Audrain, Michelle |
|
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet | |
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Payor: PETER J. MINEO ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A007854; ;Amount: $401.00 |
|
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Fee Payor: PETER J. MINEO ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A007854; ;Amount: $10.00 |
|
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet |