Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Laurence Finkelstein,Vera Finkelstein Plaintiff vs. The Carlton (Boca Raton) Condominium Association, Inc. Defendant
On January 17, 2018 a condominium action case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL. Judge Robinson, Michael A. presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 17, 2018
Last Refreshed
September 17, 2023
Filing Location
Broward County, FL
Filing Court House
Central Courthouse
Category
Condominium Action
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Condominium
Status
Transfer
Overview
Causes of Action
COUNT III NEGLIGENCE
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint is filed by Laurence Finkelstein and Vera Finkelstein against The Carlton (Boca Raton) Condominium Association, Inc. The plaintiffs are seeking declaratory relief, damages, and injunctive relief. The plaintiffs allege that during H…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
Certified Mail Receipt Returned Signed
Date: Apr 05, 2018Complete File Received
Date: Apr 05, 2018Notice of Compliance
Date: Mar 20, 2018Notice of Case Transfer
Date: Mar 20, 2018Notice
Date: Mar 15, 2018Motion to Transfer
Date: Feb 27, 2018Exhibits
Date: Feb 14, 2018Amended Complaint
Date: Feb 13, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: Feb 02, 2018Exhibits
Date: Jan 17, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: Jan 17, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: Jan 17, 2018Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Certified Mail Receipt Returned Signed | |
April 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Complete File Received | |
April 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Complete File Received | |
March 22, 2018 | Docket Event | Don't Docket On This Case | |
March 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Compliance WITH COURT ORDER DATED MARCH 9. 2018Party: Plaintiff Finkelstein, Laurence Plaintiff Finkelstein, Vera |
|
March 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Case Transfer | |
March 15, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY OF RECORD, AMENDED DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES PURSUANT TO FLA. R. JD. ADMIN. 2.516 AND DIRECTIONS TO CLERK TO UPDATE ATTORNEY INFORMATION | |
February 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion to Transfer TO THE 15TH JUDICIAL CIRCUIT IN AND FOR PALM BEACH COUNTY, FLORIDAParty: Defendant The Carlton (Boca Raton) Condominium Association, Inc. |
|
February 14, 2018 | Docket Event | Exhibits | |
February 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Amended Complaint FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF, DAMAGES INJUNCTIVE RELIEFParty: Plaintiff Finkelstein, Laurence Plaintiff Finkelstein, Vera |
|
February 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance SCOTT A. SHELTON Florida Bar No.: 36486Party: Defendant Carlton Condominium Association Inc. |
|
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Exhibits | |
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Complaint (eFiled) FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF, DAMAGES & INJUNCTIVE RELIEFParty: Plaintiff Finkelstein, Laurence Plaintiff Finkelstein, Vera |
|
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet | |
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Payor: ROBERT ALAN BOUVATTE JR ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A007727; ;Amount: $401.00 |