Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Morales, Betty, Raben, Scott A., Wells Fargo Bank Na, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Booth, Mark F, Esq., Gramsky, Brittany, against Brookfield Gardens North Master Association Inc, Brookfield Gardens North No 2 Association Inc, Brookfield Gardens Recreational Center Inc, Morales, Betty, Raben, Scott A, (total of 6) See All represented by Gramsky, Brittany, Herman, Bruce Karl, Shendell, Tamar Duffner, Esq., in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Gundersen, Andrea Ruth presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 17, 2018 |
CategoryReal Prop Non-Homestead Res Fore - >$50K - <$250,000 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is a verified complaint to foreclose a mortgage filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. against the defendants Betty Morales, Scott A. Raben, Brookfield Gardens North Master Association, Inc., Brookfield Gardens Recreational Center, Inc., Broo...
Value Claim Form
Date: January 17, 2018Lis Pendens
Date: January 17, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: January 17, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 17, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: January 17, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 17, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 17, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 17, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 17, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 17, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 17, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 17, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: February 04, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: February 04, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: February 04, 2018Answer
Date: February 21, 2018Answer
Date: February 21, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: February 21, 2018Reply to Affirmative Defenses
Date: March 26, 2018Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: March 26, 2018Circuit - Notice LOP Order to Show Cause Notice of Hearing
Date: June 04, 2019Notice of Appearance
Date: May 03, 2018Suggestion of Death
Date: June 19, 2019Affidavit in Support of Motion
Date: June 18, 2019Notice of Appearance
Date: June 18, 2019Order Granting Motion
Date: September 23, 2019Order Granting Motion
Date: July 17, 2019Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: July 31, 2019Motion for Substitution of Party(S)
Date: August 30, 2019Motion to Appear Telephonically
Date: September 18, 2019Notice of Service
Date: September 05, 2019Motion for Leave to Amend
Date: January 24, 2020Order Setting
Date: March 09, 2020Re-Notice of Mediation
Date: December 01, 2020Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel
Date: July 02, 2021Final Disposition Form
Date: October 20, 2021Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 17, 2018Summons Returned Unserved
Date: February 04, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: February 04, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: February 04, 2018Answer Affirmative Defenses & Counterclaim
Date: February 12, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: February 08, 2018Response to Request for Admissions
Date: March 08, 2018Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: June 18, 2019Notice of Showing Good Cause
Date: July 10, 2019Motion to Appear Telephonically
Date: July 15, 2019Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: July 31, 2019Certificate of Service
Date: March 12, 2020Motion to Appear Telephonically
Date: March 13, 2020Notice of Hearing
Date: March 13, 2020Response to Request for Production
Date: March 26, 2020Order Granting Motion
Date: September 25, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Final Disposition Form | |
July 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel # 1003294 Kathleen D KilbrideParty: Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. |
|
December 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
Re-Notice of Mediation on Tuesday, December 1, 2020 |
|
March 26, 2020 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Production | |
March 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion to Appear Telephonically Party: Plaintiff Wells Fargo Bank NA |
|
March 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing March 17,2020, at 9:00 a.m RM WW15160 |
|
March 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Service Party: Attorney Herman, Bruce Karl Attorney Herman, Bruce Karl |
|
March 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order Setting non jt |
|
March 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
Ord Setting Non-Jury Trial 03-17-2020 9:00 AM |
|
January 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion for Leave to Amend COMPLAINTParty: Plaintiff Wells Fargo Bank NA |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.