Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Absolute Resolutions Investments Llc, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Palma, Jorge L, Esq., against Marinez, Carlos A, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Robinson, Michael A. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 02, 2018 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is filed by Absolute Resolutions Investments, LLC against Carlos A Marinez. The complaint states that Marinez entered into an agreement with WebBank for a consumer loan, but defaulted on the monthly payments. The entire balance on the ...
Notice of Appearance
Date: October 29, 2021Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing
Date: January 02, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: January 26, 2018Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: September 19, 2018Non-Military Affidavit
Date: October 31, 2018Non-Military Affidavit
Date: November 06, 2018Attorney's Affidavit
Date: November 06, 2018Letter From
Date: November 06, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 02, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 02, 2018Answer
Date: February 15, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 17, 2018Affidavit of Costs
Date: September 19, 2018Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing
Date: September 19, 2018Non-Military Affidavit
Date: September 19, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: September 20, 2018Motion to Appear Telephonically
Date: September 20, 2018Order Granting Motion
Date: October 01, 2018Affidavit of Costs
Date: November 06, 2018Motion for Continuing Writ of Garnishment
Date: October 29, 2021Certificate of Service
Date: December 10, 2021Writ of Garnishment Returned Unserved
Date: December 27, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
CC/TC of Continuing Garnishment W/Req Forms Issd THREE CERTIFIED COPIES ISSUED BACK TO ATTY FOR WRIT OF GARN |
|
December 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Writ of Garnishment Returned Unserved 12/23/21 AS GARNISHEE, TO FIRST LINE CARRIER, INC. |
|
December 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Service ON, AND NOTICE TO, DEFENDANT PURSUANT TO 77.041 (2) Fla. StatParty: Plaintiff Absolute Resolutions Investments LLC |
|
October 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
October 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion for Continuing Writ of Garnishment Party: Plaintiff Absolute Resolutions Investments LLC |
|
November 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
Non-Military Affidavit SUPPLEMENTAL |
|
November 06, 2018 | Docket Event | Attorney's Affidavit | |
November 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
Letter From Party: Plaintiff Absolute Resolutions Investments LLC |
|
November 06, 2018 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Costs | |
October 31, 2018 | Docket Event | Non-Military Affidavit |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.