Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Pierre, Jhonny, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Jaffe, Justin H, Esq., against Holguin Perez, Desiree Kristine, Morales, Sabastian, represented by De Maio, Alexandra M, Esq., in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Bidwill, Martin J. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 17, 2018 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is a legal document filed in the Circuit Court for the 17th Judicial Circuit in Broward County, Florida. The plaintiff, Jhonny Pierre, is suing the defendants, Sebastian Morales and Desiree Kristine Holguin Perez, for damages in excess...
Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 17, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 17, 2018Notice of Propounding Interrogatories
Date: January 17, 2018Notice of Propounding Interrogatories
Date: January 17, 2018Request for Production
Date: January 17, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: January 17, 2018Request for Production
Date: January 17, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: January 17, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: January 17, 2018Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: January 17, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: January 17, 2018Motion to Quash
Date: February 21, 2018Motion to Strike
Date: March 22, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: May 17, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: May 17, 2018Answer
Date: June 15, 2018Order Denying Motion
Date: July 03, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: July 06, 2018Notice
Date: June 15, 2018Response to Request for Admissions
Date: July 11, 2018Final Disposition Form
Date: September 28, 2018Notice of Cancellation
Date: July 25, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 17, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 17, 2018Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: February 17, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: March 12, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: March 12, 2018Notice of Service
Date: June 15, 2018Motion for Emergency Hearing
Date: July 11, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: July 11, 2018Stipulation for Dismissal
Date: September 28, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Final Disposition Form | |
September 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
Stipulation for Dismissal w/prej |
|
July 25, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
July 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Response to Request for Admissions Party: Defendant Holguin Perez, Desiree Kristine |
|
July 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Emergency Hearing Party: Defendant Morales, Sabastian Defendant Holguin Perez, Desiree Kristine |
|
July 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing 8/01/2018 8:45am #16160 |
|
July 06, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition | |
July 03, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order Denying Motion to Quash |
|
June 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
Answer Party: Defendant Holguin Perez, Desiree Kristine |
|
June 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice OF DISCLOSURE/ALEXANDRA M DE MAIO ESQ |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.