Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Myrie, Markeemo K, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Kleinberg, David, against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, St Warmington, Christopher K, represented by Critelli-Fabiano, Sheri, Critelli, Sheri Lynn, Eisenberg, Tiffany, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Bowman, John B. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 17, 2018 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is filed by Markeemo K. Myrie against Christopher K. St Warmington and State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. The complaint alleges negligence on the part of Christopher K. St Warmington, who operated his motor vehicle in a ne...
Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 17, 2018Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: March 20, 2018Answer to Request for Admissions
Date: January 29, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: February 19, 2018Notice of Service
Date: February 23, 2018Request for Production
Date: February 23, 2018Response to Request for Admissions
Date: February 27, 2018Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: March 02, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: March 12, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: March 21, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: March 26, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: April 17, 2018Request for Production
Date: May 08, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: May 08, 2018Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: May 08, 2018Notice of Filing/Affidavit of Service Returned Served
Date: May 15, 2018Response to Request for Admissions
Date: May 14, 2018Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: May 15, 2018Request for Production
Date: May 15, 2018Stipulation for Dismissal
Date: July 09, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 17, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 17, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 17, 2018Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: January 29, 2018Request for Production
Date: January 29, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: February 08, 2018Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: February 19, 2018Notice of Filing
Date: February 20, 2018Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: February 22, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: February 23, 2018Request for Copies (Pursuant to Rule 1.351)
Date: March 05, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: March 19, 2018Response to Request for Admissions
Date: April 17, 2018Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories
Date: April 17, 2018Motion to Compel
Date: April 24, 2018Interrogatories & Notice of Service
Date: May 08, 2018Reply to Affirmative Defenses
Date: May 14, 2018Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: May 08, 2018Notice of Filing/Affidavit of Service Returned Served
Date: May 15, 2018Notice of Cancellation
Date: June 14, 2018Notice of Filing/Affidavit of Service Returned Served
Date: June 13, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Stipulation for Dismissal STIPULATION FOR FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AGAINST DEFENDANT, TATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY, ONLY |
|
June 14, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
June 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing/Affidavit of Service Returned Served SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM |
|
May 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing/Affidavit of Service Returned Served April 26, 2016 on STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY SUBPOENA & LEGAL INFORMATION REUEST |
|
May 15, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Production From Non-Party | |
May 15, 2018 | Docket Event | Request for Production | |
May 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing/Affidavit of Service Returned Served April 26, 2018 on STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY |
|
May 14, 2018 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Admissions | |
May 14, 2018 | Docket Event | Reply to Affirmative Defenses | |
May 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request for Production Party: Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.