Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Brown, Christopher, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Cecere, Michael, Esq., against American Integrity Claims Services, represented by Seibert, Troy Jonathan, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Bowman, John B. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 17, 2018 |
CategoryOther - Insurance Claim |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is filed by Christopher Brown against American Integrity Insurance Company of Florida. The complaint states that the plaintiff is seeking an amount in excess of $15,000, exclusive of attorney's fees, costs, and interest. The defendant,...
Amended Complaint
Date: March 15, 2018Agreed Order
Date: March 13, 2018eSummons Issuance - On Amended
Date: March 15, 2018Motion to Compel
Date: July 12, 2018Notice of Cancellation
Date: August 15, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: September 27, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: October 09, 2018Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: October 09, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 17, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 17, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 17, 2018Motion to Dismiss
Date: February 22, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: March 13, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: March 28, 2018Request to Produce
Date: April 02, 2018Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: April 02, 2018Answer to Affirmative Defenses
Date: April 02, 2018Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: May 09, 2018Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: May 09, 2018Request to Produce
Date: May 09, 2018Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: June 14, 2018Privilege Log
Date: June 14, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: June 14, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: July 18, 2018Re-Notice of Hearing
Date: July 25, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: August 15, 2018Agreed Order
Date: August 15, 2018Unopposed Motion
Date: September 04, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: September 05, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: October 09, 2018Re-Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: October 15, 2018Notice of Service of Expert Interrogatories
Date: October 24, 2018Re-Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: November 01, 2018Notice of Cancellation
Date: November 06, 2018Answer to Amended Complaint
Date: April 19, 2018Reply to Affirmative Defenses
Date: May 21, 2018Notice of Cancellation
Date: July 27, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 06, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
November 01, 2018 | Docket Event | Re-Notice of Taking Deposition | |
October 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Service of Expert Interrogatories Party: Plaintiff Brown, Christopher |
|
October 15, 2018 | Docket Event | Re-Notice of Taking Deposition | |
October 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance Angel I. Rivera, Esq., Florida Bar No.: 117384 (Designation of Email Address) |
|
October 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories Party: Plaintiff Brown, Christopher |
|
October 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Response to Request for Production Party: Plaintiff Brown, Christopher |
|
September 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum Plaintiff, CHRISTOPHER BROWN |
|
September 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum | |
September 04, 2018 | Docket Event |
Unopposed Motion FOR ENTRY UPON LAN DParty: Defendant American Integrity Claims Services |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.