Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Westlake Flooring Company Llc, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Liebler, James Randolph, Ii, against Florida Department Of Motor Vehicles, Four Star Auto Sales Inc, Teeple, Richard Edgar, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Rodriguez, Carlos Augusto presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 17, 2018 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is filed by Westlake Flooring Company, LLC, a California limited liability company, against Four Star Auto Sales, Inc., Richard Edgar Teeple, and the Florida Department of Motor Vehicles. Westlake Flooring alleges that Four Star Auto S...
eSummons Issuance
Date: January 19, 2018Notice of Cancellation
Date: January 22, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: January 18, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 17, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 19, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 19, 2018Circuit - Notice LOP Order to Show Cause Notice of Hearing
Date: November 27, 2018Motion for Emergency Hearing
Date: January 17, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 17, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 27, 2018 | Docket Event | Circuit - Notice LOP Order to Show Cause Notice of Hearing | |
January 22, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
January 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF MOTOR VEHICLES |
|
January 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance RICHARD EDGAR TEEPLE |
|
January 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance FOUR STAR AUTO SALES, INC |
|
January 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Fee Payor: JAMES RANDOLPH LIEBLER II ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A009224; ;Amount: $10.00 |
|
January 18, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet | |
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Emergency Hearing Party: Plaintiff Westlake Flooring Company LLC |
|
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Complaint (eFiled) Party: Plaintiff Westlake Flooring Company LLC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.