Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Garland, Brian William, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Jaffe, Justin H, Esq., against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, Viincent, Marie Ange, represented by Flanagan, Patrick B, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Robinson, Michael A. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 17, 2018 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is filed by Brian William Garland against Marie Ange Vincent for damages resulting from a motor vehicle accident. The complaint states that the accident occurred on March 26, 2017, in Broward County, Florida, at the intersection of Sta...
Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: January 17, 2018eSummons Issuance - On Amended
Date: February 09, 2018Notice of Propounding Interrogatories
Date: January 17, 2018Request for Production
Date: January 17, 2018Amended Complaint
Date: February 09, 2018Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: March 06, 2018Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: March 12, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: March 06, 2018Answer & Demand for Jury Trial
Date: March 12, 2018Request
Date: March 12, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: March 12, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: March 12, 2018Interrogatories & Notice of Filing
Date: March 12, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: March 18, 2018Request to Produce
Date: March 20, 2018Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: April 03, 2018Request
Date: April 05, 2018Notice
Date: April 06, 2018Certificate of No Objection
Date: April 18, 2018Order Extending Time
Date: April 19, 2018Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: May 21, 2018Response to Request to Produce
Date: June 05, 2018Response to Request for Admissions
Date: June 05, 2018Certificate of No Objection
Date: June 05, 2018Notice of Cancellation
Date: June 18, 2018Amended Answer
Date: September 18, 2018Re-Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: June 11, 2018Notice of Cancellation
Date: July 13, 2018Re-Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: July 17, 2018Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: July 02, 2018Request for Copies
Date: July 18, 2018Re-Notice
Date: July 25, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: July 26, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: August 03, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: September 05, 2018Notice of Cancellation
Date: August 03, 2018Amended
Date: August 15, 2018Order on Motion to Compel
Date: August 28, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: September 18, 2018Response to Memorandum
Date: November 21, 2018Order
Date: October 30, 2018Motion to Compel Answers to Interrogatories
Date: December 17, 2018Privilege Log
Date: November 13, 2018Motion to Compel
Date: November 20, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: January 17, 2019Summons Returned Served
Date: January 14, 2019Notice of Filing
Date: January 08, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: January 17, 2019Subpoena Filed
Date: January 18, 2019Notice for/of Trial
Date: January 21, 2019Order Setting
Date: January 22, 2019Order to Show Cause
Date: January 28, 2019Certificate of Non-Appearance
Date: January 23, 2019Notice of Mediation
Date: January 28, 2019Expert Witness List
Date: March 11, 2019Witness List
Date: March 11, 2019Motion for Rule to Show Cause
Date: March 29, 2019Request to Produce
Date: March 29, 2019Interrogatories & Notice of Filing
Date: April 05, 2019Notice of Service of Expert Interrogatories
Date: March 29, 2019Motion in Limine
Date: April 05, 2019Request for Copies
Date: April 17, 2019Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: April 12, 2019Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: April 23, 2019Motion in Limine
Date: April 26, 2019Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: April 29, 2019Supplemental Response - Request for Production
Date: April 30, 2019Mediation Report
Date: April 29, 2019Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: April 30, 2019Certificate of No Objection
Date: May 01, 2019Response to Request for Production
Date: May 28, 2019Notice of Filing
Date: May 08, 2019Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: May 30, 2019Subpoena for Deposition Returned Served
Date: May 29, 2019Request for Copies
Date: May 30, 2019Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: May 30, 2019Subpoena Issued By Attorney
Date: June 26, 2019Motion to Compel
Date: July 05, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: July 05, 2019Notice of Filing Interrogs
Date: July 05, 2019Response to Memorandum
Date: July 11, 2019Notice of Cancellation
Date: July 11, 2019Order Granting Motion
Date: July 17, 2019Motion
Date: July 12, 2019Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: July 15, 2019Order Resetting
Date: July 29, 2019Compliance
Date: December 12, 2019Notice of Compliance
Date: December 12, 2019Request for Admissions
Date: January 17, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 17, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 17, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 17, 2018Request for Production
Date: March 06, 2018Notice
Date: April 06, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: April 09, 2018Request for Copies
Date: April 09, 2018Notice of Cancellation
Date: April 11, 2018Re-Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: April 30, 2018Supplemental Request to Produce
Date: May 11, 2018Request for Copies
Date: May 21, 2018Re-Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: June 27, 2018Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: July 16, 2018Motion for Protective Order
Date: July 20, 2018Motion to Compel
Date: July 23, 2018Certificate of No Objection
Date: July 31, 2018Motion to Compel Discovery
Date: August 03, 2018Response
Date: October 24, 2018Notice of Filing Deposition
Date: December 26, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: December 26, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: January 14, 2019Motion for Rule to Show Cause
Date: January 16, 2019Amended Notice of Hearing
Date: January 17, 2019Certificate
Date: February 08, 2019Notice of Service
Date: February 20, 2019Notice of Cancellation
Date: March 01, 2019Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: March 05, 2019Request for Copies
Date: March 22, 2019Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: March 22, 2019Certificate of No Objection
Date: March 25, 2019Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: March 29, 2019Witness List
Date: March 29, 2019Interrogatories & Notice of Service
Date: April 05, 2019Request for Production of Documents
Date: April 05, 2019Response to Request to Produce
Date: April 29, 2019Expert Witness List
Date: May 02, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: May 06, 2019Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement
Date: May 03, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: May 14, 2019Amended Witness List
Date: May 23, 2019Re-Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: May 23, 2019Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: May 28, 2019Request for Production
Date: May 30, 2019Response to Request for Production
Date: May 30, 2019Expert Interrogatories
Date: May 30, 2019Re-Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: May 30, 2019Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: May 30, 2019Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: May 31, 2019Re-Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: June 10, 2019Order Granting Motion
Date: June 11, 2019Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: June 11, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: June 11, 2019Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: June 17, 2019Re-Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: June 26, 2019Order Granting
Date: June 28, 2019Subpoena for Deposition Returned Unserved
Date: July 02, 2019Certificate of No Objection
Date: July 03, 2019Notice of Cancellation
Date: July 03, 2019Notice of Service
Date: July 05, 2019Re-Notice of Hearing
Date: July 11, 2019Request for Admissions
Date: July 05, 2019Notice of Intent
Date: July 11, 2019Amended Witness List
Date: July 12, 2019Response to Request for Admissions
Date: July 15, 2019Request for Copies
Date: July 17, 2019Exhibit List
Date: July 16, 2019Notice of Service
Date: July 18, 2019Motion in Limine
Date: July 19, 2019Request for Admissions
Date: July 18, 2019Joint Pre-Trial Stipulation
Date: July 19, 2019Motion in Limine
Date: July 19, 2019Motion in Limine
Date: July 19, 2019Exhibit List
Date: July 25, 2019Notice of Cancellation
Date: July 31, 2019Response to Request for Admissions
Date: August 02, 2019Answer to Interrogs
Date: August 02, 2019Compliance
Date: December 12, 2019Amended Witness List
Date: December 12, 2019Compliance
Date: December 12, 2019Compliance
Date: December 12, 2019Compliance
Date: December 13, 2019Order Resetting
Date: January 15, 2020Objection
Date: January 03, 2020Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: January 17, 2018Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: April 06, 2018Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: July 18, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 15, 2020 | Docket Event | Order Resetting | |
January 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes/Jury Sworn | |
January 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Objection TO PLAINTIFF'S EXHIBIT LISTParty: Defendant STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY |
|
December 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
Compliance Party: Defendant STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY |
|
December 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
Compliance Party: Defendant STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY |
|
December 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
Compliance WITH PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR COPIESParty: Defendant STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY |
|
December 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Compliance WITH PLAINTIFF'S REOUEST FOR COPIESParty: Defendant STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY |
|
December 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
Compliance WITH PLAINIUYrs REOUEST FOR CpPIESParty: Defendant STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY |
|
December 12, 2019 | Docket Event | Amended Witness List | |
December 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
Compliance WITH PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FORCQPIESParty: Defendant STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.