Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Bustamante, Nathilde, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Takiff, Michael S, Esq., against Federated National Insurance Company, represented by Koltnow, Amy Lyn, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Phillips, Carol-Lisa presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 17, 2018 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is filed by Nathilde Bustamante against Federated National Insurance Company. The complaint alleges damages resulting from a covered loss to the Plaintiff's property, which was insured under a homeowner's insurance policy issued by the...
Request for Production
Date: January 17, 2018Certified Copy
Date: January 17, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 17, 2018Comment:
Date: January 17, 2018Complaint
Date: January 17, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: January 17, 2018Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: January 17, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: January 17, 2018Comment:
Date: January 17, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: January 17, 2018Acceptance of Service By Secretary of State
Date: January 17, 2018Certified Copy
Date: January 17, 2018Circuit - Notice LOP Order to Show Cause Notice of Hearing
Date: December 19, 2018Receipt for Transfer
Date: January 17, 2018Notice of Firm Name Change
Date: January 09, 2019Motion to Compel
Date: December 28, 2018Order
Date: March 05, 2019Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: March 15, 2019Reply
Date: March 18, 2019Calendar Call-Order Setting Trial
Date: September 23, 2019Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: August 27, 2019Copy
Date: January 17, 2018Affidavit of Lost Summons
Date: January 17, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
Calendar Call-Order Setting Trial CALENDAR CALL: 05-07-2020 |
|
August 27, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Case Management Conference SEPTEMBER 17, 2019 AT 8:45 AM |
|
March 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
Reply Party: Plaintiff Bustamante, Nathilde |
|
March 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
Answer & Affirmative Defenses Party: Defendant Federated National Insurance Company |
|
March 05, 2019 | Docket Event | Order | |
January 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Firm Name Change Party: Plaintiff Bustamante, Nathilde |
|
December 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel Party: Plaintiff Bustamante, Nathilde |
|
December 19, 2018 | Docket Event | Circuit - Notice LOP Order to Show Cause Notice of Hearing | |
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request for Production TO DEFTParty: Plaintiff Bustamante, Nathilde |
|
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Certified Copy of Agreed Order on Pltfs Motion to Transfer Venue/Granted |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.