Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Olazabal, Walter, Peoples Trust Insurance Company, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Hooker, George A, Messinger, Max, Messinger, Max Michael, against Olazabal, Walter, People'S Trust Insurance Company, represented by Hooker, George A, Messinger, Max, Messinger, Max Michael, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Frink, Keathan B. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 17, 2018 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is filed by Walter Olazabal against People's Trust Insurance Company for breach of contract, declaratory relief, and a demand for a jury trial. The plaintiff alleges that the defendant, an insurance company authorized to do business in...
Notice of Video Deposition
Date: January 17, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 17, 2018Motion to Compel
Date: May 03, 2018Response to Request for Admissions
Date: March 13, 2018Interrogatories
Date: May 07, 2018Request to Produce
Date: May 07, 2018Notice of Cancellation
Date: August 31, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 17, 2018Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: January 17, 2018Notice of Filing
Date: January 25, 2018Interrogatories
Date: January 17, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 17, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: January 17, 2018Request for Production
Date: January 17, 2018Answer Affirmative Defenses & Crossclaim
Date: March 13, 2018Motion for Enlargement of Time
Date: March 09, 2018eSummons Issuance - On Counter-Claim
Date: March 13, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: February 14, 2018Motion for Enlargement of Time
Date: February 07, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: March 01, 2018Response to Request to Produce
Date: March 13, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: March 27, 2018Answer to Counterclaim
Date: April 16, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: May 07, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: May 07, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: May 15, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: May 21, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: June 19, 2018Response to Request for Admissions
Date: June 19, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: June 28, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 31, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
June 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSESParty: Plaintiff Peoples Trust Insurance Company Defendant People's Trust Insurance Company |
|
June 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSESParty: Defendant People's Trust Insurance Company Plaintiff Peoples Trust Insurance Company |
|
June 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time Party: Plaintiff Olazabal, Walter Defendant Olazabal, Walter |
|
June 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Response to Request for Admissions Party: Plaintiff Olazabal, Walter |
|
May 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance Party: Plaintiff Olazabal, Walter |
|
May 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance Party: Plaintiff Peoples Trust Insurance Company Defendant People's Trust Insurance Company |
|
May 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance Party: Defendant People's Trust Insurance Company Plaintiff Peoples Trust Insurance Company |
|
May 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Interrogatories Party: Defendant People's Trust Insurance Company |
|
May 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request to Produce Party: Defendant People's Trust Insurance Company |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.