Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Francis, Anthon, Francis, Nalda, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Zanakos, Christina N, against United Property & Casualty Insurance Company, represented by Kelley, Brian W, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Haimes, David A. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 17, 2018 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is filed by the plaintiffs, Anthon Francis and Nalda Francis, against the defendant, United Property & Casualty Insurance Company. The plaintiffs allege that they owned and resided in a dwelling insured by the defendant in Broward Coun...
Request for Production
Date: January 17, 2018Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: March 27, 2018Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: January 17, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 17, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: January 17, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: January 29, 2018Response to Request for Admissions
Date: April 02, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: April 02, 2018Notice
Date: January 15, 2019Re-Notice of Mediation
Date: March 21, 2019Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 17, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 17, 2018Acceptance of Service By Secretary of State
Date: February 05, 2018Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories
Date: April 02, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: September 05, 2018Order for Substitution of Counsel
Date: November 28, 2018Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: November 29, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: November 29, 2018Certificate of No Objection
Date: January 31, 2019Subpoena Returned Served
Date: February 22, 2019Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: February 26, 2019Subpoena Returned Served
Date: February 28, 2019Notice of Mediation
Date: March 12, 2019Notice of Unavailability
Date: April 04, 2019Notice
Date: April 04, 2019Notice of Settlement
Date: June 05, 2019Stipulation
Date: July 29, 2019Notice of Cancellation
Date: June 05, 2019Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel
Date: November 13, 2018Not of Intent to Serve Subpoenas Under Rule 1.351
Date: January 16, 2019Notice of Unavailability
Date: January 15, 2019Notice of Settlement
Date: June 05, 2019Request for Admissions
Date: January 17, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
Stipulation OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE |
|
June 05, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTLEMENTParty: Plaintiff Francis, Anthon Plaintiff Francis, Nalda | |
June 05, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
June 05, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTLEMENTParty: Plaintiff Francis, Nalda Plaintiff Francis, Anthon | |
April 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Unavailability Christina Zanakos, Esq |
|
April 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY WITHIN FIRMParty: Plaintiff Francis, Anthon Plaintiff Francis, Nalda |
|
March 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
Re-Notice of Mediation 06/04/2019 10:00am |
|
March 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Mediation 06/04/2018 Tuesday 10:00 A.M |
|
February 28, 2019 | Docket Event | Subpoena Returned Served | |
February 28, 2019 | Docket Event | Subpoena Returned Served |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.