Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Hernandez, Francisca P, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Gross, Philip, against Baez, Raul A, represented by Arbide, Z Suzanne, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Singer, Michele Towbin presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 17, 2018 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is filed by Diego Perez on behalf of Francisca P. Hernandez against Raul A. Baez. Hernandez is a resident of Miami-Dade County and the mother of Perez and Baez. Perez is the attorney in fact for Hernandez under a Durable Power of Attor...
eSummons Issuance
Date: January 17, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 17, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: February 12, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: February 12, 2018Re-Notice of Hearing
Date: September 04, 2018Mediation Report
Date: January 31, 2019Order
Date: October 11, 2018Notice of Mediation
Date: January 09, 2019Notice to Set Case for Trial
Date: November 07, 2018Joint Stipulation
Date: May 01, 2019Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: November 01, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 17, 2018Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: February 12, 2018Request for Production
Date: March 13, 2018Motion to Dismiss
Date: March 13, 2018Agreed Order
Date: February 13, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: April 27, 2018Notice of Unavailability
Date: May 15, 2018Notice of Cancellation
Date: May 15, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
Joint Stipulation Party: Plaintiff Hernandez, Francisca P |
|
January 31, 2019 | Docket Event | Mediation Report | |
January 09, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Mediation | |
November 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice to Set Case for Trial Party: Plaintiff Hernandez, Francisca P |
|
November 01, 2018 | Docket Event | Answer & Affirmative Defenses | |
October 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order on mot to dismiss the complaint - Denied |
|
September 04, 2018 | Docket Event | Re-Notice of Hearing | |
May 15, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Unavailability | |
May 15, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
April 27, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.