Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Avila, Matthew, Avila, Nicole, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Daniels, Monica E, Esq., against Federated National Insurance Company, represented by Cutrona, Melissa Taylor, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Phillips, Carol-Lisa presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 16, 2018 |
CategoryOther - Insurance Claim |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is filed by Matthew Avila and Nicole Avila against Federated National Insurance Company (FNIC). The plaintiffs allege that they purchased homeowner's insurance from FNIC to cover their property located in Broward County, Florida. On Se...
Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 16, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: January 16, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: January 16, 2018Interrogatories
Date: January 16, 2018Request for Production
Date: January 16, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: January 16, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 16, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: January 29, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 16, 2018Notice of Cancellation
Date: February 02, 2018Notice of Settlement
Date: February 02, 2018Notice of Cancellation
Date: February 02, 2018Notice of Cancellation
Date: February 02, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Cancellation OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF Scott Fuller (field adjuster |
|
February 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Settlement Party: Plaintiff Avila, Matthew Plaintiff Avila, Nicole |
|
February 02, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF TAKING LIVE DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF DEFENDANT'S CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVEPURSUANT TO FLORIDA'S RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 1.310(b)(6 | |
February 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Cancellation the deposition upon oral examination of (CLAIMS ADJUSTER) |
|
January 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance & DISCLOSURE. AND DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESSParty: Defendant Federated National Insurance Company |
|
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Payor: MONICA ELIZABETH JORDAN ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A007245; ;Amount: $401.00 |
|
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Fee Payor: MONICA ELIZABETH JORDAN ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A007245; ;Amount: $10.00 |
|
January 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Complaint (eFiled) Party: Plaintiff Avila, Matthew Plaintiff Avila, Nicole |
|
January 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum Scott Fuller (field adjuster) / March 26, 2018 at 3:00 PM |
|
January 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum Defendant's Designated Corporate Representative / March 26, 2018 at 10:00am |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.