Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Scheible, Jeffrey, filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case represented by Caine, Daniel, against Brown, Audley Livingston, Denault, Lydia, Denault, Theodore, Richardson, Nea, R P Funding Inc, (total of 5) See All represented by Beamer, William D, Lopez, Samuel Damon, Esq., Lopez, Samuel D, Esq., in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Haury, William W., Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 16, 2018 |
CategoryFraud |
Last RefreshedOctober 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is filed by Jeffrey Scheible as the personal representative of the Estate of Janice Johnson against Audley Livingston Brown, Theodore Denault, Lydia Denault, Nea Richardson, and R P Funding, Inc. The complaint seeks damages in excess o...
Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 16, 2018Letter From
Date: January 16, 2018Request for Production
Date: January 16, 2018Request for Production
Date: January 16, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 16, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 16, 2018Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: January 16, 2018Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: January 16, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 16, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 16, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 16, 2018Motion to Dismiss
Date: February 12, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 16, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: January 26, 2018Motion to Strike Claim for Attorneys Fees
Date: February 12, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: March 06, 2018Order Granting Motion to Strike
Date: April 04, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: May 14, 2018Response to Motion to Dismiss
Date: May 24, 2018Amended Complaint
Date: April 16, 2018Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: April 05, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: April 24, 2018Motion to Compel Discovery
Date: April 25, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: April 26, 2018Motion to Dismiss
Date: May 07, 2018Order Denying Motion to Dismiss
Date: June 04, 2018Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: June 25, 2018Order Denying Motion to Dismiss
Date: July 10, 2018Re-Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: December 13, 2018Answer to Amended Complaint
Date: August 07, 2018Re-Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: October 02, 2018Request for Copies
Date: October 04, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: December 03, 2018Notice of Unavailability
Date: December 06, 2018Re-Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: January 16, 2019Re-Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: January 14, 2019Re-Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: January 11, 2019Amended Notice of Hearing
Date: February 04, 2019Response to Motion
Date: June 05, 2019Notice of Service
Date: August 14, 2019Order
Date: August 14, 2019Witness List
Date: September 10, 2019Request for Copies
Date: August 16, 2019Amended Witness List
Date: September 12, 2019Witness List
Date: September 13, 2019Notice of Cancellation
Date: October 04, 2019Notice of Unavailability
Date: October 11, 2019Expert Witness List
Date: October 15, 2019Mediation Report
Date: December 20, 2019Motion to Withdraw
Date: January 02, 2020Notice of Hearing
Date: January 06, 2020Certificate of No Objection
Date: January 06, 2020Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: January 06, 2020Order
Date: January 21, 2020Notice
Date: January 21, 2020Order Case Exhibits in Courtroom
Date: January 22, 2020Verdict
Date: January 24, 2020Jury Instructions
Date: January 24, 2020Jury Questions
Date: January 24, 2020Order Discharging Lis Pendens
Date: February 05, 2020Re-Notice of Hearing
Date: April 27, 2020Notice of Hearing
Date: May 04, 2020Notice of Filing
Date: May 12, 2020Order Granting Motion
Date: August 06, 2020Acknowledgment
Date: August 27, 20204th DCA Order
Date: September 22, 2020Acknowledgment
Date: August 31, 2020Appeal Record Completed
Date: October 14, 2020Notice of Hearing
Date: December 04, 2020Acknowledgment
Date: January 07, 2021Appeal Transcript
Date: January 07, 2021Notice of Filing
Date: February 04, 2021Order of Referral
Date: February 25, 2021Lis Pendens
Date: January 16, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: January 16, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: January 16, 2018Letter From
Date: January 16, 2018Letter From
Date: January 16, 2018Letter From
Date: January 16, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: January 16, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: January 16, 2018Request for Production
Date: January 16, 2018Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: January 16, 2018Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: January 16, 2018Motion to Take Judicial Notice
Date: February 12, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: March 06, 2018Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: March 20, 2018Response
Date: March 23, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: March 27, 2018Privilege Log
Date: March 27, 2018Order Granting Motion
Date: April 04, 2018Motion to Dismiss
Date: April 04, 2018Notice of Service
Date: April 05, 2018Motion to Dismiss
Date: April 18, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: April 24, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: May 09, 2018Motion for Enlargement of Time
Date: May 09, 2018Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: June 08, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: June 25, 2018Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: June 25, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: September 28, 2018Response to Notice to Produce
Date: October 03, 2018Interrogatories & Answer Thereto
Date: October 03, 2018Cross Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: November 08, 2018Cross Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: December 13, 2018Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: January 18, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: February 01, 2019Motion to Compel Discovery
Date: March 14, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: April 04, 2019Notice of Cancellation
Date: April 16, 2019Notice of Withdrawal
Date: April 16, 2019Notice of Filing Affidavit
Date: June 03, 2019Response to Motion
Date: June 03, 2019Motion
Date: July 16, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: July 19, 2019Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: July 22, 2019Re-Notice of Hearing
Date: July 23, 2019Uniform Order Setting Pretrial Deadline
Date: August 14, 2019Witness & Exhibit List
Date: September 12, 2019Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: September 12, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: September 18, 2019Motion to Appear Telephonically
Date: September 20, 2019Agreed Order
Date: September 23, 2019Agreed Order
Date: September 23, 2019Motion for Extension of Time
Date: October 08, 2019Supplemental Disclosure of Expert Witness List
Date: October 23, 2019Motion for Summary Final Judgment
Date: November 22, 2019Notice of Mediation
Date: December 09, 2019Motion for Continuance
Date: December 19, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: December 20, 2019Notice of Unavailability
Date: December 20, 2019Request for Copies
Date: December 20, 2019Motion to be Excused from Trial Docket
Date: December 22, 2019Request for Production
Date: December 23, 2019Re-Notice of Hearing
Date: January 08, 2020Order Granting Motion to Withdraw
Date: January 21, 2020Jury Panel Information List
Date: January 24, 2020Clerk's Minutes/Jury Sworn
Date: January 24, 2020Exhibit List
Date: January 24, 2020Court Hearing Worksheet
Date: January 24, 2020Jury Questions
Date: January 24, 2020Jury Instructions
Date: January 24, 2020Motion to Discharge Lis Pendens
Date: February 05, 2020Motion to Tax Costs
Date: February 06, 2020Motion
Date: February 07, 2020Notice of Hearing
Date: March 18, 2020Notice of Settlement
Date: April 06, 2020Motion for Final Judgment
Date: April 06, 2020Response to Motion
Date: May 18, 2020Motion to Withdraw
Date: June 29, 2020Order Granting Motion to Withdraw
Date: July 13, 2020Notice of Appeal
Date: August 25, 20204th DCA Order
Date: August 27, 2020Pre-billed Appellant pending payment of:
Date: September 02, 2020Amended Notice of Appeal
Date: August 28, 2020Final Bill Appeal Preparation fees pending in amount of:
Date: October 14, 2020Motion
Date: November 18, 20204th DCA Order
Date: October 29, 20204th DCA Order
Date: December 01, 2020Appeal Transcript
Date: February 04, 2021Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: April 12, 2021Supplemental Record Completed
Date: May 07, 20214th DCA Order
Date: May 05, 2021Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: October 28, 20214th DCA Order
Date: February 09, 2022Notice of Hearing
Date: June 29, 2020Amended Order
Date: December 17, 2020Notice of Service
Date: September 09, 2020Order Vacating
Date: April 20, 2021Notice of Cancellation
Date: April 27, 2020Case Management Order
Date: March 23, 2022Motion for Extension of Time
Date: September 16, 2019Answer to Amended Complaint
Date: August 07, 2018Notice of Service of Expert Interrogatories
Date: August 15, 2019Motion to Set Aside Default
Date: January 31, 2020Calendar Call-Order Resetting Trial
Date: August 05, 2020Motion to Take Judicial Notice
Date: February 12, 2018Motion to Dismiss
Date: February 12, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case Management Order 05-06-2022 10:30 AM |
|
February 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
4th DCA Order 4D20-1899; KH/ ORDERED that appellant's October 28, 2021 motion for attorney's fees is granted coditioned on the trial court determining that appellant is entitled to fees under section 768.79, Forida Statutes (2021), and if so, setting the amount of the attorney's fees to be awarded for thisappellate case. |
|
October 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Case Management Conference on 12-03-2021 |
|
May 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Supplemental Record Completed 4D20-1899 SUPPLEMENT/ KH |
|
May 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Appeal Record Transmitted to 4DCA 4D20-1899 SUPPLEMENT/ KH |
|
May 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
4th DCA Order 4D20-1899; KH/ ORDERED that appellant's May 4, 2021 motion to supplement the record is granted |
|
April 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Vacating CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER |
|
April 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Order Setting Case Management Conference | |
February 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order of Referral TO NONBINDING ARBITRATION, MEDIATION |
|
February 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing APPELLATE TRANSCRIPT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.