Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
National Collegiate Student Loan Trust 2007-2, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case against Delpercio, Collins, represented by Nevins, Nathan E, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Robinson, Michael A. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 16, 2018 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is filed by National Collegiate Student Loan Trust 2007-2 against Collins Delpercio. The plaintiff alleges that Delpercio executed a loan request to attend Nova Southeastern University and failed to make the required monthly payments. ...
Motion to Transfer
Date: January 16, 2018Case Summary
Date: January 16, 2018Alias Summons Returned Served
Date: January 16, 2018Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing
Date: January 16, 2018Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: January 16, 2018Notice
Date: January 16, 2018Affidavit
Date: January 16, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: January 16, 2018Complaint
Date: January 16, 2018Writ
Date: January 16, 2018Writ
Date: January 16, 2018Record
Date: January 16, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 16, 2018Agreed Order
Date: January 17, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: January 17, 2018Motion to Dismiss
Date: February 02, 2018Settlement Agreement
Date: March 14, 2018Motion for Enlargement of Time
Date: January 17, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice OF SATISFACTIONParty: Plaintiff National Collegiate Student Loan Trust 2007-2 |
|
March 14, 2018 | Docket Event | Settlement Agreement | |
February 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss Party: Defendant Delpercio, Collins |
|
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Agreed Order ON MOTION TO ENLARGE TIME TO FILE RESPONSE /GRANTED |
|
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance Party: Defendant Delpercio, Collins |
|
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Enlargement of Time Party: Defendant Delpercio, Collins |
|
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Payor: POLLACK AND ROSEN ; Userid: CTS-carcher ; Receipt: 20181YE1E000078; omments: BC 403202/NSIS ;Amount: $401.00 |
|
January 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Motion to Transfer | |
January 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Case Summary | |
January 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Alias Summons Returned Served |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.