Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
First Call 24 7, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Rossi, Ana Cristina, against Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company, represented by Brant, Todd E, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Bowman, John B. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 16, 2018 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is filed by First Call 24/7, acting on behalf of Elizabeth Kates, against Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company. The complaint alleges breach of contract and demands a jury trial. The plaintiff claims damages exceeding $15,00...
Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 16, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 16, 2018Motion for Default
Date: March 14, 2018Order Granting Motion to Compel
Date: July 25, 2018Request to Produce
Date: January 16, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: January 16, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 16, 2018Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: January 16, 2018Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: March 01, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: January 23, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: March 01, 2018Motion to Dismiss
Date: March 12, 2018Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Count(s)
Date: March 21, 2018Response
Date: March 15, 2018Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: March 22, 2018Reply to Affirmative Defenses
Date: March 22, 2018Motion to Compel
Date: June 11, 2018Motion to Compel Discovery
Date: July 19, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: July 19, 2018Order Granting Motion
Date: July 25, 2018Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel
Date: July 31, 2018Consent to Substitution of Counsel
Date: August 07, 2018Notice
Date: September 21, 2018Motion for Order to Show Cause
Date: January 24, 2019Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: February 26, 2019Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: May 13, 2019Request to Produce
Date: May 13, 2019Motion for Extension of Time
Date: June 13, 2019Motion to Appear Telephonically
Date: July 19, 2018Order on Motion to Compel
Date: July 31, 2018Response to Request to Produce
Date: October 02, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT'S DISCOVERY REQUESTSParty: Plaintiff First Call 24/7 |
|
May 13, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Interrogs | |
May 13, 2019 | Docket Event | Request to Produce | |
February 26, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum | |
January 24, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion for Order to Show Cause , TO COMPEL. AND FOR SANCTIONS FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH COURT ORDERS DATED JULY 24, 2018 AND JULY31, 2018Party: Plaintiff First Call 24/7 |
|
October 02, 2018 | Docket Event | Response to Request to Produce | |
September 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice NAME CHANGEParty: Plaintiff First Call 24/7 |
|
August 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Consent to Substitution of Counsel Party: Defendant Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company |
|
July 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel Emily K. Smith, Esquire Florida Bar No.: 98784Party: Defendant Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company |
|
July 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order on Motion to Compel DEPOSTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.