Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Luna, Angela, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Duboff, Kenneth, against American Security Insurance Company, represented by Brown, Jonathan C, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Perlman, Sandra presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 16, 2018 |
CategoryOther - Insurance Claim |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is filed by Angela Luna against American Security Insurance Company. The complaint alleges that Angela Luna is the owner of a property located at 3650 Inverrary Drive 61T, Laudcrhill, Florida 33319. Angela Luna had an insurable interes...
Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 16, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: February 13, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: February 14, 2018Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement
Date: April 20, 2018Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: January 16, 2018Request for Production
Date: January 16, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 16, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 16, 2018Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: January 16, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: January 16, 2018Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: February 13, 2018Agreed Order
Date: March 19, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: April 11, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: April 30, 2018Response to Request for Admissions
Date: April 30, 2018Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: May 02, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 02, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories | |
April 30, 2018 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Production | |
April 30, 2018 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Admissions | |
April 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement | |
April 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time (SECOND MOTION) TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S DISCOVERY REQUESTSParty: Defendant American Security Insurance Company |
|
March 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Agreed Order GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S DISCOVERY REQUESTS |
|
February 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time Party: Defendant American Security Insurance Company |
|
February 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance AND DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESSESParty: Defendant American Security Insurance Company |
|
February 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Answer & Affirmative Defenses Party: Defendant American Security Insurance Company |
|
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Payor: KENNETH R DUBOFF ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A007140; ;Amount: $401.00 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.