Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Jerome, Irlande, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Duboff, Kenneth, against American Security Insurance Company, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Haimes, David A. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 16, 2018 |
CategoryOther - Insurance Claim |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is filed by Plaintiff IRLANDE JEROME against Defendant AMERICAN SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY. The Plaintiff alleges that they are the owner of a property located at 7776 Di Lido Boulevard, Miramar, Florida 33023. The Plaintiff had an ins...
Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: January 16, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 16, 2018Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: January 16, 2018Request for Production
Date: January 16, 2018Response to Request for Admissions
Date: March 19, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: March 07, 2018Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: March 19, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: March 19, 2018Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: April 07, 2018Response to Request to Produce
Date: April 07, 2018Notice
Date: August 02, 2018Notice of Settlement
Date: August 16, 2019Notice of Mediation
Date: May 03, 2019Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 16, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: January 16, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 16, 2018Request for Production
Date: February 06, 2018Notice of Interrogatories
Date: February 06, 2018Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: February 12, 2018Agreed Order
Date: March 07, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: March 09, 2018Motion for Mediation
Date: July 25, 2018Notice
Date: September 07, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Settlement Party: Plaintiff Jerome, Irlande |
|
May 03, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Mediation | |
September 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice Of Similar CaseParty: Defendant American Security Insurance Company |
|
August 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice OF AGREEMENT OF MEDIATORParty: Plaintiff Jerome, Irlande |
|
July 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Mediation Party: Plaintiff Jerome, Irlande |
|
April 07, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories | |
April 07, 2018 | Docket Event | Response to Request to Produce | |
March 19, 2018 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Admissions | |
March 19, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories | |
March 19, 2018 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Production |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.