Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Krainski, Sharae, Krainski , Timothy, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Smith, Kimesha S, Esq., against Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company, represented by Rodriguez, Lazaro C, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Phillips, Carol-Lisa presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 16, 2018 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is filed by Timothy Krainski and Sharae Krainski against Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company. The plaintiffs allege breach of contract by the defendant regarding an insurance policy for their property located at 10711 NW 26...
Request for Production
Date: January 16, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 16, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: March 12, 2018Order for Substitution of Counsel
Date: June 18, 2018Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel
Date: June 18, 2018Consent to Substitution of Counsel
Date: June 18, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: June 20, 2018Order Setting
Date: July 24, 2018Subpoena for Deposition Duces Tecum Returned Served
Date: December 17, 2018Interrogatories
Date: January 16, 2018Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: January 16, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 16, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: February 09, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 16, 2018Notice of Acceptance of Service of Process
Date: February 01, 2018Response to Request for Admissions
Date: March 16, 2018Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: March 12, 2018Notice of Settlement
Date: January 09, 2019Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: March 19, 2018Motion to Compel Discovery
Date: April 12, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: May 30, 2018Notice of Cancellation
Date: June 20, 2018Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories
Date: June 20, 2018Response to Request for Admissions
Date: June 20, 2018Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: July 05, 2018Exhibits
Date: July 20, 2018Joint Motion to Continue
Date: July 19, 2018Agreed Order
Date: July 20, 2018Stipulation
Date: August 21, 2018Notice of Mediation
Date: September 18, 2018Notice of Cancellation
Date: October 02, 2018Witness List
Date: November 14, 2018Motion for Continuance
Date: December 13, 2018Certificate
Date: December 12, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: December 13, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: December 13, 2018Expert Witness List
Date: December 14, 2018Motion
Date: December 20, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: December 20, 2018Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: January 08, 2019Motion to Enforce
Date: January 29, 2019Notice of Cancellation
Date: January 09, 2019Motion
Date: March 13, 2019Request for Admissions
Date: January 16, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: May 24, 2018Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: June 21, 2018Motion to Compel
Date: November 16, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT AND MOTON FOR SANCTIONSParty: Plaintiff Krainski , Timothy Plaintiff Krainski, Sharae |
|
January 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion to Enforce SETTLEMENTParty: Defendant Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company |
|
January 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Settlement reached a settlement agreementParty: Plaintiff Krainski , Timothy Plaintiff Krainski, Sharae |
|
January 09, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
January 09, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
January 08, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories | |
December 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion JOINT MOTION FOR CONTINUANCEParty: Plaintiff Krainski , Timothy Plaintiff Krainski, Sharae |
|
December 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
December 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Subpoena for Deposition Duces Tecum Returned Served SANTOS LEAL - 14th day of December, 2018 |
|
December 14, 2018 | Docket Event | Expert Witness List |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.