Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Zenkich, Elias R, filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case represented by Tracht, Deborah Bianchi, against Zenkich, Margaret, represented by Weintraub, Karen, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Fahnestock, Fabienne E. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 16, 2018 |
CategoryNeg - Business Tort |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is filed by Elias R. Zenkich, individually and as trustee of the Elias R. Zenkich Revocable Trust, and as General Partner of the Zenkich Family Limited Partnership, managing member of Galt Ocean 1502, LLC, against Margaret Zenkich, ind...
Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 16, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 16, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 16, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: February 22, 2018Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: March 09, 2018Motion to Transfer & Consolidate
Date: April 04, 2018eSummons Not Issued - Atty advised
Date: May 25, 2018Amended Complaint
Date: May 25, 2018Notice of Cancellation
Date: May 26, 2018eSummons Not Issued - Atty advised
Date: June 07, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: June 07, 2018Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel
Date: November 16, 2018Motion
Date: June 11, 2018Notice of Unavailability
Date: July 19, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: September 20, 2018Notice of Charging Lien
Date: October 26, 2018Notice of Charging Lien
Date: November 15, 2018Notice of Withdrawal
Date: December 07, 2018Order for Substitution of Counsel
Date: December 11, 2018Satisfaction of Lien
Date: January 16, 2019Order Resetting Hearing
Date: December 06, 2019Circuit - Notice LOP Order to Show Cause Notice of Hearing
Date: November 19, 2019Notice of Absence
Date: March 09, 2018Motion for Enlargement of Time
Date: March 13, 2018Agreed Order
Date: March 28, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: April 09, 2018Notice of Absence
Date: December 26, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: March 09, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order Resetting Hearing LACK OF PROSECUTION HEARING - FEBRUARY 17, 2020 |
|
November 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Circuit - Notice LOP Order to Show Cause Notice of Hearing | |
January 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
Satisfaction of Lien NOTICE |
|
December 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Absence | |
December 11, 2018 | Docket Event | Order for Substitution of Counsel | |
December 07, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Withdrawal | |
November 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel FBN #88773Party: Plaintiff Zenkich, Elias R Plaintiff Zenkich, Elias R |
|
November 15, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Charging Lien | |
October 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Charging Lien | |
September 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance Party: Plaintiff Zenkich, Elias R Plaintiff Zenkich, Elias R |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.