Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Mcburrows, Tedra, filed a(n) Discrimination - Labor and Employment case represented by Storch, Noah E, against C Davis Electric Co Inc, represented by Caulkins, Charles S, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Haimes, David A. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 16, 2018 |
CategoryOther - Discrimination Employment Or Other |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeDiscrimination |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is filed by Tedra McBurrows against C. Davis Electric Co., Inc. The complaint alleges that the plaintiff, who is a homosexual female, was subjected to discriminatory treatment by her supervisor, Ron Toombs, based on her sexual orientat...
Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 16, 2018Motion to Stay
Date: January 30, 2019Notice of Appearance
Date: January 30, 2019Order Granting Motion to Stay
Date: February 24, 2020Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 16, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 16, 2018Circuit - Notice LOP Order to Show Cause Notice of Hearing
Date: December 03, 2018Notice of Unavailability
Date: January 29, 2019Circuit - Notice LOP Order to Show Cause Notice of Hearing
Date: December 16, 2019Exhibits
Date: February 24, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 24, 2020 | Docket Event | Order Granting Motion to Stay | |
February 24, 2020 | Docket Event | Exhibits | |
December 16, 2019 | Docket Event | Circuit - Notice LOP Order to Show Cause Notice of Hearing | |
January 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion to Stay JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS PENDING ARBITRATIONParty: Plaintiff Mcburrows, Tedra Defendant C Davis Electric Co Inc |
|
January 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance Party: Defendant C Davis Electric Co Inc |
|
January 29, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Unavailability | |
December 03, 2018 | Docket Event | Circuit - Notice LOP Order to Show Cause Notice of Hearing | |
January 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Complaint (eFiled) AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIALParty: Plaintiff Mcburrows, Tedra |
|
January 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet | |
January 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance C. DAVIS ELECTRIC CO INC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.