Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Joubert, Mark Anthony, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Ross, Bradley A, Esq., against Johnson, Dennis Melford, Jr., represented by Kader, Yasser R, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Haimes, David A. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 16, 2018 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is filed by the Plaintiff, Mark Anthony Joubert, against the Defendant, Dennis Melford Johnson Jr. The Plaintiff is seeking damages in excess of $15,000.00, exclusive of interest and costs. The incident in question occurred on January ...
Request for Admissions
Date: January 16, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 16, 2018Request for Production
Date: January 16, 2018Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: January 16, 2018Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: February 09, 2018Reply to Affirmative Defenses
Date: February 12, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: February 09, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: February 15, 2018Response to Request for Admissions
Date: February 14, 2018Response to Request to Produce
Date: March 19, 2018Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: March 19, 2018Calendar Call-Order Setting Trial
Date: May 02, 2018Notice
Date: October 10, 2018Notice
Date: August 14, 2018Request for Physical Examination
Date: August 13, 2018Notice of Interrogatories
Date: January 16, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 16, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 16, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: January 31, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: February 09, 2018Request for Production
Date: February 09, 2018Answer to Complaint
Date: February 09, 2018Response to Request for Admissions
Date: March 19, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: March 23, 2018Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories
Date: March 23, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: March 29, 2018Motion
Date: April 24, 2018Notice of Jury Trial
Date: April 24, 2018Notice
Date: April 24, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: April 24, 2018Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: May 02, 2018Re-Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: May 15, 2018Request
Date: August 13, 2018Amended Answer to Amended Complaint
Date: June 05, 2018Notice of Mediation
Date: August 28, 2018Notice of Mediation
Date: August 27, 2018Mediation Report
Date: October 23, 2018Stipulation for Dismissal
Date: November 28, 2018Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: February 14, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Stipulation for Dismissal | |
October 23, 2018 | Docket Event | Mediation Report | |
October 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice OF INTENT TO USE MEDICAL BILL SUMMARYParty: Plaintiff Joubert, Mark Anthony |
|
August 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Mediation | |
August 27, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Mediation | |
August 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice OF INTENTION TO VIDEOTAPE IME WITH STEPHEN J. JACOBS, M.D 09/26/18 9:15 AMParty: Plaintiff Joubert, Mark Anthony |
|
August 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request for Physical Examination Mark Joubert 09/26/18 9:15 amParty: Defendant Johnson, Dennis Melford, Jr. |
|
August 13, 2018 | Docket Event | Request | |
June 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Amended Answer to Amended Complaint Party: Defendant Johnson, Dennis Melford, Jr. |
|
May 15, 2018 | Docket Event | Re-Notice of Taking Deposition |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.