Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Secretary Of The Us Department Of Housing, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Davis, Steven Mark, against 71C Team Llc, Cambridge At Century Village Condominium #Ii Association, Inc, Cohen, Claire B., Cohen, Steven, represented by Masri, Samir, Esq., Mcfarland, Timothy M, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Gundersen, Andrea Ruth presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 16, 2018 |
CategoryReal Prop Non-Homestead Res Fore - >$50K - <$250,000 |
Last RefreshedOctober 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is a foreclosure action filed by the Secretary of the U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development (HUD) against multiple defendants. The plaintiff, HUD, is the owner of the mortgage and note related to the property in question. Th...
eSummons Issuance
Date: January 19, 2018Notice of Lis Pendens
Date: January 16, 2018Value Claim Form
Date: January 16, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 16, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 19, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 19, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 19, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: January 31, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: February 01, 2018Circuit - Notice LOP Order to Show Cause Notice of Hearing
Date: June 04, 2019Motion for Extension of Time
Date: February 20, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: February 21, 2018Agreed Order
Date: May 21, 2018Summons Returned Unserved
Date: February 21, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: February 20, 2018Certificate of Service
Date: May 29, 2018Notice of Dropping Parties- Generic
Date: July 12, 2019Motion to Dismiss
Date: June 08, 2018Motion for Default & Default
Date: July 12, 2019Affidavit of Diligent Search
Date: July 12, 2019Certificate of Mailing
Date: July 16, 2019Proof of Publication
Date: August 01, 2019Certificate of Service
Date: August 02, 2019Notice of Filing
Date: August 05, 2019Order Denying Motion to Dismiss
Date: August 19, 2019Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: September 03, 2019Motion to Appoint Guardian Ad Litem
Date: September 05, 2019Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: October 30, 2019Motion for Discharge of Guardian Ad Litem
Date: June 25, 2021Order Granting Motion to Stay
Date: July 01, 2021Response to Request for Admissions
Date: October 15, 2021Affidavit
Date: October 27, 2021Notice of Filing
Date: October 29, 2021Motion to Compel Discovery
Date: November 10, 2021Notice of Hearing
Date: November 01, 2021Response to Request for Production
Date: November 12, 2021Notice of Filing
Date: November 15, 2021Order Denying Motion to Dismiss
Date: January 12, 2022Notice of Prod of Documents
Date: November 29, 2021Order Denying Motion
Date: December 10, 2021Notice of Filing Affidavit
Date: December 17, 2021Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: November 29, 2021Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: January 16, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 16, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 19, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 19, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 19, 2018Summons Returned Unserved
Date: February 07, 2018Summons Returned Unserved
Date: February 08, 2018Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: February 13, 2018Summons Returned Unserved
Date: February 08, 2018Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: February 13, 2018Non-Military Affidavit
Date: July 12, 2019Directions to the Clerk
Date: July 12, 2019Notice of Action
Date: July 16, 2019Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: July 31, 2019Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: July 31, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: August 08, 2019Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem Administrator
Date: September 09, 2019Answer to Complaint
Date: October 30, 2019Amended Answer
Date: October 31, 2019Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: June 11, 2021Motion to Stay
Date: June 18, 2021Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: July 19, 2021Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: September 14, 2021Motion for Leave to File
Date: October 27, 2021Order Granting Leave to Amend Complaint
Date: November 17, 2021Motion to Dismiss
Date: December 06, 2021Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: December 06, 2021Answer to Amended Complaint
Date: December 06, 2021Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: January 27, 2022Order Discharging Guardian Ad Litem
Date: July 12, 2021Request for Admissions
Date: September 17, 2021Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: September 17, 2021Request to Produce
Date: September 17, 2021Reply to Affirmative Defenses
Date: February 02, 2022Notice of Hearing
Date: November 12, 2021Notice of Hearing
Date: December 17, 2021Notice of Filing Affidavit
Date: October 18, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Reply to Affirmative Defenses | |
January 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Answer & Affirmative Defenses TO AMENDED COMPLAINTParty: Defendant 71C Team LLC |
|
January 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Denying Motion to Dismiss AMENDED COMPLAINT |
|
December 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing Affidavit | |
December 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
December 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Denying Motion TO COMPEL DISCOVERY REQUESTS AND FOR REIMBURSEMENT OF ATTYS FEES AND COSTS |
|
December 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss AMENDED COMPLAINT TO FORECLOSE MORTGAGEParty: Defendant 71C Team LLC |
|
December 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses Party: Defendant Cambridge at Century Village Condominium #II Association, Inc |
|
December 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Answer to Amended Complaint to PlaintiffsParty: Defendant Cambridge at Century Village Condominium #II Association, Inc |
|
November 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Prod of Documents |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.