Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
King , Svetlana, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Boyd, R Brian, against Glyeco Acquisition, Morris , Alfonso Reginald, represented by Demanovich, Stephen J, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Bowman, John B. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 16, 2018 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is a legal document filed in the Circuit Court of the Seventeenth Judicial Circuit in Broward County, Florida. The plaintiff, Svetlana King, is suing the defendants, Glyeco Acquisition Corp #3 and Alfonso Reginaldo Morris, for damages ...
eSummons Issuance
Date: January 16, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 16, 2018Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: February 16, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 16, 2018Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: February 16, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: February 16, 2018Reply
Date: February 19, 2018Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: March 10, 2018Response to Request for Admissions
Date: March 10, 2018Request for Production
Date: March 14, 2018Interrogatories
Date: March 14, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: March 23, 2018Privilege Log
Date: April 17, 2018Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: April 20, 2018Interrogatories
Date: May 23, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: June 25, 2018Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement
Date: September 05, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: February 27, 2018Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: February 27, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: March 14, 2018Notice of Filing
Date: March 27, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: April 03, 2018Response to Request for Admissions
Date: April 17, 2018Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: April 12, 2018Response to Request to Produce
Date: April 17, 2018Request for Production
Date: May 23, 2018Reply to Affirmative Defenses
Date: May 23, 2018Re-Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: June 27, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: August 22, 2018Notice of Video Deposition
Date: August 22, 2018Request for Production
Date: February 27, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 16, 2018Order Extending Time
Date: April 09, 2018Request for Copies
Date: April 13, 2018Response to Request to Produce
Date: April 25, 2018Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: May 04, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement | |
August 22, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition | |
August 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Video Deposition SVETLANA KING, AUGUST 24, 2018 @ 10:00 A.M. |
|
August 22, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition | |
June 27, 2018 | Docket Event | Re-Notice of Taking Deposition | |
June 25, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition | |
May 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
Interrogatories TO DEFENDANT ALFONSO REGINALDO MORRISParty: Plaintiff King , Svetlana |
|
May 23, 2018 | Docket Event | Request for Production | |
May 23, 2018 | Docket Event | Reply to Affirmative Defenses | |
May 04, 2018 | Docket Event |
Answer & Affirmative Defenses Party: Defendant Morris , Alfonso Reginald |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.