Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Lillie Anderson Plaintiff vs. Walgreens Co Defendant
On January 16, 2018 a neg - premises liability commercial case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL. Judge Robinson, Michael A. presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 16, 2018
Last Refreshed
January 04, 2024
Filing Location
Broward County, FL
Filing Court House
Circuit
Category
Neg - Premises Liability Commercial
Practice Area
Commercial
Matter Type
General Commercial
Status
Closed
Overview
Causes of Action
COUNT I- PREMISES LIABILITY
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint is filed by Lillie Anderson against Walgreen Co. The complaint alleges that on October 28, 2016, while Lillie Anderson was a business invitee at a Walgreens property located at 201 N. Hiatus Road in Broward County, Florida, she sli…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
Response to Request for Copies
Date: Jan 31, 2019Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement
Date: Jan 03, 2019Subpoena Duces Tecum Returned Served
Date: Dec 11, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: Dec 07, 2018Notice of Unavailability
Date: Dec 05, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: Dec 04, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: Nov 28, 2018Motion for Summary Final Judgment
Date: Nov 21, 2018Request to Produce
Date: Sep 28, 2018Notice
Date: Sep 11, 2018Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement
Date: Jul 20, 2018Certificate of No Objection
Date: Jun 15, 2018Response to Request for Copies
Date: Jun 15, 2018Certificate of No Objection
Date: Jun 13, 2018Request for Copies
Date: Jun 07, 2018Denial of Affirmative Defenses
Date: Jun 07, 2018Notice of Video Deposition
Date: Jun 06, 2018Certificate of No Objection
Date: Jun 01, 2018Request for Copies
Date: May 26, 2018Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: May 25, 2018Request for Copies
Date: May 18, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: May 16, 2018Response to Request for Admissions
Date: May 10, 2018Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: May 09, 2018Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: May 03, 2018Response to Request for Copies
Date: May 02, 2018Order
Date: May 01, 2018Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: Apr 30, 2018Response to Request for Admissions
Date: Apr 30, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: Apr 30, 2018Privilege Log
Date: Apr 30, 2018Order Extending Time
Date: Apr 24, 2018Unopposed Motion
Date: Apr 24, 2018Certificate of No Objection
Date: Apr 12, 2018Request for Copies
Date: Apr 11, 2018Objection to Non-Party Production
Date: Apr 11, 2018Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: Apr 10, 2018Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: Apr 03, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: Apr 02, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: Mar 21, 2018Certificate of No Objection
Date: Mar 21, 2018Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories
Date: Mar 20, 2018Response to Request for Admissions
Date: Mar 20, 2018Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: Mar 01, 2018Notice
Date: Feb 28, 2018Request for Production
Date: Feb 28, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: Feb 28, 2018Answer Affirmative Defenses
Date: Feb 28, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: Feb 13, 2018Interrogatories Notice of Filing
Date: Jan 16, 2018Request for Production
Date: Jan 16, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: Jan 16, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: Jan 16, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: Jan 16, 2018Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: Jan 16, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: Jan 16, 2018Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 31, 2019 | Docket Event |
Response to Request for Copies Party: Defendant Walgreens Co |
|
January 03, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement | |
December 11, 2018 | Docket Event | Subpoena Duces Tecum Returned Served | |
December 07, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum | |
December 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Unavailability | |
December 04, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
November 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Production | |
November 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Summary Final Judgment Party: Defendant Walgreens Co |
|
September 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Request to Produce | |
September 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice DIRECTIONS TO CLERK TO UPDATE ATTORNEY INFORMATIONParty: Plaintiff Anderson, Lillie |
|
July 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement | |
June 15, 2018 | Docket Event | Certificate of No Objection | |
June 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
Response to Request for Copies Party: Defendant Walgreens Co |
|
June 13, 2018 | Docket Event | Certificate of No Objection | |
June 07, 2018 | Docket Event | Request for Copies | |
June 07, 2018 | Docket Event | Denial of Affirmative Defenses | |
June 07, 2018 | Docket Event | Request for Copies | |
June 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Video Deposition Graciella Estevez & Sharon Finnigan. June 13, 2018 @ 10:00am & 10:30am |
|
June 01, 2018 | Docket Event | Certificate of No Objection | |
June 01, 2018 | Docket Event | Certificate of No Objection | |
May 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Request for Copies | |
May 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Production From Non-Party Party: Defendant Walgreens Co |
|
May 18, 2018 | Docket Event | Request for Copies | |
May 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition | |
May 10, 2018 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Admissions | |
May 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Production From Non-Party Party: Defendant Walgreens Co |
|
May 03, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Production From Non-Party Party: Defendant Walgreens Co |
|
May 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Response to Request for Copies Party: Defendant Walgreens Co |
|
May 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order PL OBJECTIONS TO WALGREENS REQUEST FOR ADMISSION # 1, 15, AND 25 |
|
April 30, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories | |
April 30, 2018 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Admissions | |
April 30, 2018 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Production | |
April 30, 2018 | Docket Event | Privilege Log | |
April 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order Extending Time EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S DISCOVERY REQUEST |
|
April 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Unopposed Motion FOR EXTENSION OF TIMEParty: Defendant Walgreens Co |
|
April 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Certificate of No Objection Party: Defendant Walgreens Co |
|
April 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request for Copies PLAINTIFF'S REOUEST FOR COPIES |
|
April 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Objection to Non-Party Production PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTION TO NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY |
|
April 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Production From Non-Party Party: Defendant Walgreens Co |
|
April 03, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Production From Non-Party | |
April 02, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
March 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
Response to Request for Production None in Plaintiffs possessionParty: Plaintiff Anderson, Lillie |
|
March 21, 2018 | Docket Event | Certificate of No Objection | |
March 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories | |
March 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Admissions | |
March 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Production From Non-Party Party: Defendant Walgreens Co |
|
February 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIESParty: Defendant Walgreens Co |
|
February 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request for Production Party: Defendant Walgreens Co |
|
February 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request for Admissions Party: Defendant Walgreens Co |
|
February 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
Answer & Affirmative Defenses Party: Defendant Walgreens Co |
|
February 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance Party: Defendant Walgreens Co |
|
January 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Interrogatories & Notice of Filing Walgreen CoParty: Plaintiff Anderson, Lillie |
|
January 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request for Production Walgreen CoParty: Plaintiff Anderson, Lillie |
|
January 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet | |
January 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance Prentice-Hall Corporation System Inc, Registered Agent for Walgreen CO |
|
January 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request for Admissions Walgreen Co |
|
January 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses Richard Rosenblum EsqParty: Plaintiff Anderson, Lillie |
|
January 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Complaint (eFiled) | |
January 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Payor: RICHARD ROSENBLUM ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A007032; ;Amount: $401.00 |
|
January 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Fee Payor: RICHARD ROSENBLUM ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A007032; ;Amount: $10.00 |