Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Adheen, Trevor T, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case against Miller Law Associates, represented by Miller, Jeffrey A, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Frink, Keathan B. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 16, 2018 |
CategoryProfessional Malpractice - Business |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is a legal document filed in the Circuit Court of Broward County, Florida. The plaintiff, Trevor T. Adheen, is seeking damages from the defendant, Miller Law Associates, for alleged fraudulent actions. The complaint states that on June...
Default Returned Un-Issued
Date: February 14, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: February 14, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: February 20, 2018Amended Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: February 27, 2018Complaint
Date: January 16, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 16, 2018Motion to Transfer & Consolidate
Date: January 31, 2018Motion
Date: January 31, 2018Civil Application Indigent Status
Date: January 16, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: January 31, 2018Order Granting Motion
Date: February 27, 2018Motion for Summary Final Judgment
Date: February 27, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: February 27, 2018Motion
Date: March 28, 2018Motion
Date: March 28, 2018Motion
Date: March 28, 2018Answer to Complaint
Date: February 27, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion TO DENY LOW NUMBER TRANSFER AND CONSOLIDATEParty: Plaintiff Adheen, Trevor T |
|
March 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion TO DENY ANSWER AND AMENDED ANSWER FOR DISMISSALParty: Plaintiff Adheen, Trevor T |
|
March 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion To Deny Summary JudgmentParty: Plaintiff Adheen, Trevor T |
|
February 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
Amended Answer & Affirmative Defenses Party: Defendant Miller Law Associates |
|
February 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Motion FOR LOW NUMBER TRANSFER |
|
February 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Summary Final Judgment Party: Defendant Miller Law Associates |
|
February 27, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
February 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
Answer to Complaint Party: Defendant Miller Law Associates |
|
February 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
February 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
Default Returned Un-Issued Answer on 1/31/18. Notice of hearing sent to Judge |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.