Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Alverez De Souza, Marcela Alejandra, Easy Gas & Oil Llc, Soares De Souza, Secles, filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case represented by Rudman, Melissa A, against Miami Commercial Properties Of Georgia Llc, South Florida Commercial Properties Of Georgia Llc, represented by Hendler, Michelle G, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Tuter, Jack presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 16, 2018 |
CategoryFraud |
Last RefreshedOctober 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is filed by SECLES SOARES DE SOUZA, MARCELA ALEJANDRA ALVEREZ DE SOUZA, and EASY GAS & OIL, LLC against SOUTH FLORIDA COMMERCIAL PROPERTIES OF GEORGIA, LLC and MIAMI COMMERCIAL PROPERTIES OF GEORGIA, LLC. The plaintiffs allege that the...
Notice of Filing
Date: July 09, 2021Order to Compel
Date: March 17, 2021Order Extending Time
Date: June 24, 2021Response to Motion to Dismiss
Date: August 05, 2021Notice of Filing
Date: February 23, 2021Interrogatories
Date: January 16, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 16, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 16, 2018Request for Production
Date: January 16, 2018Notice of Intent to File in Complex Business & Tort Division
Date: January 16, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 16, 2018Judge Reassigned - Per AO 2014-16-Civ (Complex)
Date: February 01, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: January 26, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: April 06, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: January 26, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: January 30, 2018Notice of Unavailability
Date: January 30, 2018Agreed Order
Date: April 12, 2018Interrogatories
Date: March 05, 2018Motion to Dismiss
Date: March 15, 2018Amended Complaint
Date: April 26, 2018Request for Production
Date: March 05, 2018Exhibits
Date: May 11, 2018Exhibits
Date: April 26, 2018Motion for Default Final Judgment
Date: May 11, 2018Notice of Withdrawal
Date: May 14, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: May 30, 2018Response to Motion to Dismiss
Date: July 13, 2018Notice of Unavailability
Date: June 26, 2018Reply
Date: July 23, 2018Exhibits
Date: August 27, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: September 19, 2018Third Amended Complaint
Date: July 09, 2021Amended Complaint
Date: August 31, 2021Order
Date: August 16, 2021Notice of Hearing
Date: July 30, 2021Notice of Hearing
Date: March 30, 2022Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 16, 2018Notice of Unavailability
Date: January 26, 2018Notice of Unavailability
Date: January 26, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: January 30, 2018Motion to Dismiss
Date: May 16, 2018Order Granting Motion
Date: July 26, 2018Second Amended Complaint
Date: August 27, 2018Exhibits
Date: September 04, 2018Exhibits
Date: September 05, 2018eSummons Issuance - On Amended
Date: September 05, 2018eSummons Issuance - On Amended
Date: September 05, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: September 11, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: September 21, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: October 01, 2018Motion to Dismiss 2nd Amended Complaint
Date: November 02, 2018Motion to Dismiss 2nd Amended Complaint
Date: November 02, 2018Response to Motion to Dismiss
Date: July 15, 2020Order Granting Motion
Date: May 19, 2021Motion for Extension of Time
Date: June 04, 2021Motion to Dismiss
Date: July 29, 2021Notice of Filing
Date: August 31, 2021Motion to Dismiss
Date: September 20, 2021Notice of Filing
Date: July 15, 2020Notice of Hearing
Date: March 19, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 30, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
September 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINTParty: Defendant South Florida Commercial Properties Of Georgia LLC |
|
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event |
Amended Complaint FOURTHParty: Plaintiff Easy Gas & Oil LLC |
|
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing INDEX OF EXHBITS REFERENCED IN PLAINTIFF'S FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINTParty: Plaintiff Easy Gas & Oil LLC |
|
August 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS |
|
August 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Response to Motion to Dismiss | |
July 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
July 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT AND INCORPORATED MOTION TO STRIKE |
|
July 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing INDEX OF EXHBITS REFERENCED IN PLAINTIFFS' THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINTParty: Plaintiff Soares De Souza, Secles Plaintiff Alverez De Souza, Marcela Alejandra Plaintiff Easy Gas & Oil LLC |
|
July 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Third Amended Complaint Fla. Bar No. 550191 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.