Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Hernandez, Edwardo, Hernandez, Jackeline, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Delombard, Rene Manuel, against Federated National Insurance Company, represented by Sharpe, Laurie, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Rodriguez, Carlos Augusto presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 16, 2018 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is filed by Eduardo Hernandez and Jackeline Hernandez against Federated National Insurance Company. The plaintiffs are seeking damages that exceed $15,000, exclusive of interest, costs, and attorneys' fees. The defendant is a Florida C...
Notice of Appearance
Date: February 09, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: May 07, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: April 20, 2018Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: June 15, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: June 15, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: January 16, 2018Request for Production of Documents
Date: January 16, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 16, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 16, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: March 23, 2018Notice of Unavailability
Date: April 11, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: May 18, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 16, 2018Notice of Filing Interrogs
Date: January 16, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
Answer & Affirmative Defenses Party: Defendant Federated National Insurance Company |
|
June 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time To Plaintiff's Discovery Served with the Complaint |
|
May 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time Party: Defendant Federated National Insurance Company |
|
May 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S DISCOVERY SERVED WITH THE COMPLAINTParty: Defendant Federated National Insurance Company |
|
April 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINTParty: Defendant Federated National Insurance Company |
|
April 11, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Unavailability | |
March 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time Party: Defendant Federated National Insurance Company |
|
March 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time Party: Defendant Federated National Insurance Company |
|
February 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance Party: Defendant Federated National Insurance Company |
|
January 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request for Admissions to Defendant Federated National Insurance CompanyParty: Plaintiff Hernandez, Edwardo Plaintiff Hernandez, Jackeline |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.