Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Mesia, Teresa, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Goldglantz, Joseph B, against American Security Insurance Company, represented by Brown, Jonathan C, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Bowman, John B. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 16, 2018 |
CategoryOther - Insurance Claim |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is filed by Teresa Mesia against American Security Insurance Company. The plaintiff alleges that the defendant issued a homeowners' insurance policy for her property located in Fort Lauderdale, Florida. The policy provides coverage for...
Notice of Appearance
Date: January 23, 2018Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: March 09, 2018Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: April 07, 2018Response to Request to Produce
Date: April 05, 2018Order
Date: February 11, 2019eSummons Issuance
Date: January 16, 2018Request for Production
Date: January 16, 2018Interrogatories
Date: January 16, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 16, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: January 23, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 16, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: May 09, 2018Notice of Cancellation
Date: June 15, 2018Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: February 05, 2019Request
Date: January 16, 2018Re-Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: June 12, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order Discovery Response Time and Motion to Compel Discovery |
|
February 05, 2019 | Docket Event | Order Setting Case Management Conference | |
June 15, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
June 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Re-Notice of Taking Deposition | |
May 09, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum | |
May 09, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum | |
April 07, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories | |
April 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Response to Request to Produce | |
March 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Answer & Affirmative Defenses Party: Defendant American Security Insurance Company |
|
January 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance Jonathan C. Brown, Esq. (FL Bar No. 82148) Sara L. Solano, Esq. (FL Bar No. 117966Party: Defendant American Security Insurance Company |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.