Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Kohn, Jacqueline, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Devaney, Donna B, against State Farm Florida Insurance Company, represented by Hunter, Brian Charlton, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Circuit with Bidwill, Martin J. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 16, 2018 |
CategoryOther - Insurance Claim |
Last RefreshedMay 20, 2024 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
Jacqueline Kohn is suing State Farm Florida Insurance Company for breach of contract related to State Farm's refusal to indemnify Kohn for a covered cause of loss during the policy period. The policy was in effect on October 29, 2017, when Kohn disc...
Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: January 16, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: April 25, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: May 09, 2018Response to Request for Admissions
Date: June 11, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: July 31, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: July 31, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: August 01, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: January 16, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 16, 2018Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: January 16, 2018Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: June 06, 2018Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: May 23, 2018Certificate of No Objection
Date: June 14, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: June 28, 2018Certificate of Compliance
Date: October 04, 2018Request
Date: October 29, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: October 30, 2018Notice of Cancellation
Date: October 30, 2018Certificate
Date: November 13, 2018Request to Produce
Date: January 16, 2018Exhibits
Date: January 16, 2018Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: January 16, 2018Request for Production
Date: April 09, 2018Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: February 26, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 16, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 16, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: March 08, 2018Request for Copies
Date: June 06, 2018Motion to Compel Answers to Interrogatories
Date: June 13, 2018Notice of Filing
Date: January 18, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: June 06, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: January 30, 2018Motion for Enlargement of Time
Date: February 08, 2018Answer to Complaint
Date: February 26, 2018Motion for Enlargement of Time
Date: March 06, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: July 03, 2018Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: March 08, 2018Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories
Date: July 02, 2018Response to Request for Admissions
Date: February 26, 2018Answer to Interrogs
Date: April 09, 2018Reply to Affirmative Defenses
Date: June 19, 2018Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: June 14, 2018Response to Request for Admissions
Date: July 02, 2018Expert Witness List
Date: September 28, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: June 21, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: June 26, 2018Motion for Partial Final Judgment
Date: June 27, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: June 26, 2018Motion to Set Cause for Trial
Date: July 10, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: June 28, 2018Notice of Settlement
Date: November 16, 2018Amended Notice of Hearing
Date: November 13, 2018Notice of Service
Date: June 28, 2018Notice of Cancellation
Date: July 03, 2018Certificate
Date: November 14, 2018Notice of Cancellation
Date: August 21, 2018Mediation Report
Date: November 20, 2018Notice of Cancellation
Date: November 27, 2018Order Setting
Date: August 23, 2018Notice of Mediation
Date: August 28, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: September 19, 2018Notice of Cancellation
Date: September 21, 2018Witness List
Date: September 27, 2018Witness List
Date: September 28, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 07, 2018 | Docket Event | Dismissed Before Hearing - Other | |
December 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal W/Prejudice Vol./Book 0 , Page 0, 1 pages Instrument Number 115495253 |
|
November 27, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
November 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Mediation Report | |
November 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Settlement Party: Defendant State Farm Florida Insurance Company; Party: Plaintiff Jacqueline Kohn; Party: Deendant - State Farm Florida Insurance Company |
|
November 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
Certificate OF APPEARANCE AND AUTHORITYParty: Defendant State Farm Florida Insurance Company |
|
November 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Certificate OF AUTHORITY PURSUANT TO FLA. R. CIV. P. 1.720Party: Plaintiff Kohn, Jacqueline |
|
November 13, 2018 | Docket Event | Amended Notice of Hearing | |
October 30, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
October 30, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.