Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Impact Site Development Of Florida Llc, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Friedman, Michael Jonathan, against Constrology Llc, Pp Omni Ventures Llc, represented by Frederick, Mitchell Burgess, Garrity, Joseph David, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Singer, Michele Towbin presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 16, 2018 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is filed by Impact Site Development of Florida, LLC against Constrology, LLC and PP Omni Ventures, LLC. Impact is seeking damages exceeding $15,000. Impact is a Florida limited liability company based in Boca Raton, Florida, while Cons...
Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: March 12, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 16, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 16, 2018Affidavit of Service
Date: January 25, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: March 12, 2018Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: February 23, 2018Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: March 12, 2018Request for Production
Date: March 12, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: March 12, 2018Notice of Filing Affidavit
Date: April 27, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: April 26, 2018Motion
Date: April 26, 2018Motion
Date: April 27, 2018Order Compelling Discovery
Date: May 01, 2018Notice of Cancellation
Date: May 04, 2018Order Setting
Date: May 17, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: May 18, 2018Motion for Order to Show Cause
Date: May 24, 2018Ex Parte Motion
Date: June 01, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: June 19, 2018Notice of Cancellation
Date: July 18, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: June 20, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: June 19, 2018Discharge of Lis Pendens
Date: October 04, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 16, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 16, 2018Affidavit of Service
Date: January 25, 2018Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: February 23, 2018Request for Production
Date: March 12, 2018Reply to Affirmative Defenses
Date: March 12, 2018Ex Parte Motion
Date: April 18, 2018Notice for/of Trial
Date: April 20, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: April 26, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: May 17, 2018Ex Parte Motion
Date: June 01, 2018Response to Motion
Date: June 19, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: June 19, 2018Notice of Cancellation
Date: August 01, 2018Order Granting Motion
Date: August 01, 2018Response to Motion
Date: June 19, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 04, 2018 | Docket Event | Discharge of Lis Pendens | |
August 01, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
August 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Motion FOR ENTRY OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND MOTION FOR SANCTIONS |
|
July 18, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
July 18, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
June 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
June 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance Party: Defendant Constrology LLC |
|
June 19, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
June 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Response to Motion TO DEEM REOUESTS FOR ADMISSIONS ADMITTEDParty: Defendant Constrology LLC Defendant PP Omni Ventures LLC |
|
June 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance Party: Defendant PP Omni Ventures LLC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.