Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Said, Shreif, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Green, Seth Phillip, against Binger, Linda R, represented by Zimmerman, Naomi A, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with McCarthy, Barbara presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 16, 2018 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is a legal document filed by the plaintiff, Shreif Said, against the defendant, Linda R. Binger, in the Circuit Court of the 17th Judicial Circuit in Broward County, Florida. The plaintiff is seeking damages that exceed $15,000. The co...
eSummons Issuance
Date: January 16, 2018Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: January 16, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: January 16, 2018Request to Produce
Date: January 16, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 16, 2018Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: February 05, 2018Agreed Order
Date: March 23, 2018Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: January 16, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 16, 2018Acceptance of Service
Date: January 25, 2018Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: February 05, 2018Request for Production
Date: February 05, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: February 05, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: February 05, 2018Response to Request for Admissions
Date: February 06, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: March 02, 2018Motion to Compel Discovery
Date: March 19, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: March 28, 2018Order Compelling Discovery
Date: March 23, 2018Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement
Date: April 10, 2018Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: April 16, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: April 19, 2018Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories
Date: April 19, 2018Response to Request to Produce
Date: April 23, 2018Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories
Date: April 23, 2018Answer to Request for Admissions
Date: April 23, 2018Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: April 30, 2018Notice of Filing/Affidavit of Service Returned Served
Date: July 10, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing/Affidavit of Service Returned Served SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM served |
|
April 30, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Production From Non-Party | |
April 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
Response to Request to Produce Party: Plaintiff Said, Shreif |
|
April 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories Party: Plaintiff Said, Shreif |
|
April 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
Answer to Request for Admissions Party: Plaintiff Said, Shreif |
|
April 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories Party: Plaintiff Said, Shreif |
|
April 19, 2018 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Production | |
April 19, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories | |
April 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Production From Non-Party | |
April 10, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.