Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Fulton, Tracy, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Cecere, Michael, Esq., against Felfle, Alberto E, Geico General Insurance Company, represented by Llopis, Nicole Marie, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Levenson, Jeffrey R. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 16, 2018 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is filed by Tracy Fulton against Alberto E. Felfle and Geico General Insurance Company. The complaint alleges that on January 18, 2017, Felfle, the owner and operator of a 2016 Mazda 3, negligently operated and maintained his vehicle, ...
eSummons Issuance
Date: January 16, 2018Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: March 20, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: April 02, 2018Reply to Affirmative Defenses
Date: April 03, 2018Response to Request for Admissions
Date: April 09, 2018Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: April 03, 2018Notice of Cancellation
Date: May 09, 2018Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: April 05, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: May 02, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: April 26, 2018Request for Compulsory Physical Examination
Date: April 19, 2018Response to Request to Produce
Date: May 11, 2018Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: April 09, 2018Agreed Order
Date: May 03, 2018Request for Copies
Date: May 16, 2018Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: May 11, 2018Ex Parte Motion
Date: May 17, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: May 22, 2018Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: May 22, 2018Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: June 14, 2018Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement
Date: August 31, 2018Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement
Date: June 18, 2018Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: June 27, 2018Stipulation
Date: January 03, 2019Notice of Compliance
Date: September 06, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 16, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 16, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 16, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: March 20, 2018Request for Production
Date: March 20, 2018Interrogatories & Notice of Service
Date: March 20, 2018Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: March 20, 2018Response to Request for Admissions
Date: March 29, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: April 02, 2018Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: April 02, 2018Request to Produce
Date: April 02, 2018Interrogatories & Notice of Filing
Date: April 02, 2018Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: April 03, 2018Request for Production
Date: April 03, 2018Response to Request to Produce
Date: April 03, 2018Request to Produce
Date: April 09, 2018Response
Date: May 02, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: April 27, 2018Order Compelling Discovery
Date: May 17, 2018Response to Request to Produce
Date: May 22, 2018Answer to Interrogs
Date: May 22, 2018Acceptance of Offer of Judgment
Date: September 17, 2018Cross Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: August 21, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
Stipulation FOR FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL |
|
September 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Acceptance of Offer of Judgment | |
September 06, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Compliance | |
August 31, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement | |
August 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
Cross Notice of Taking Deposition Tracy Fulton. Wednesday, August 22, 2018 @ 10:30am |
|
June 27, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Production From Non-Party | |
June 18, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement | |
June 14, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Production From Non-Party | |
May 22, 2018 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Production | |
May 22, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.