Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Ggh 51 Llc, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Marks, Deborah Brandstatter, against Diamonds And Passion Enterprises Inc, Ebury Fund Fl15 Llc, Estate Of Henry Musler Iv, Sunshine State Certificates V Lllp, Ttlreo 2 Llc, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Robinson, Michael A. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 16, 2018 |
CategoryReal Prop Other - $0 - $50,000 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is a quiet title action brought by GGH 51, LLC against various defendants. The plaintiff seeks to confirm its title to a property located in Broward County, Florida, described as Lot 8, Wilton Manors First Addition. The plaintiff claim...
eSummons Issuance
Date: January 16, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: January 29, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: February 12, 2018Notice of Filing
Date: February 15, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: February 12, 2018Motion for Judgment
Date: March 19, 2018Motion for Final Judgment
Date: March 26, 2018Circuit - Notice LOP Order to Show Cause Notice of Hearing
Date: January 23, 2019eSummons Issuance (No Fee)
Date: January 16, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 16, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 16, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 16, 2018eSummons Not Issued - Atty advised
Date: January 16, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 16, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 16, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: February 12, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: February 12, 2018Motion for Default & Default
Date: March 16, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: March 13, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 23, 2019 | Docket Event | Circuit - Notice LOP Order to Show Cause Notice of Hearing | |
March 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Final Judgment Party: Plaintiff GGH 51 LLC |
|
March 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Judgment Party: Plaintiff GGH 51 LLC |
|
March 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default & Default AgainstParty: Defendant TTLREO 2 LLC Defendant Estate of Henry Musler IV Defendant Sunshine State Certificates V LLLP Defendant Ebury Fund FL15 LLC |
|
March 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default & Default AgainstParty: Defendant Estate of Henry Musler IV Defendant Ebury Fund FL15 LLC Defendant Sunshine State Certificates V LLLP Defendant TTLREO 2 LLC |
|
March 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 1/30/18Party: Defendant TTLREO 2 LLC |
|
February 15, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing | |
February 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 2/1/17Party: Defendant Estate of Henry Musler IV |
|
February 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 1/26/2018Party: Defendant Sunshine State Certificates V LLLP |
|
February 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 2/1/17Party: Defendant Diamonds and Passion Enterprises Inc |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.