Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Xxxxxx, Xxxxxxx, filed a(n) Discrimination - Labor and Employment case represented by Remer, Jason S, against B & P Distribution, White, Curdel, represented by Solomon, Harris K, Esq., in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Haury, William W., Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 16, 2018 |
CategoryOther - Discrimination Employment Or Other |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeDiscrimination |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is filed by xxxxxxx xxxxxx, on behalf of himself and other non-exempt employees, against B & P Distribution and Curdel White. The complaint alleges violations of the Fair Labor Standards Act (FLSA) and seeks damages exceeding $15,000, ...
Notice of Appearance
Date: March 12, 2018Amended Complaint
Date: March 19, 2018Motion to Dismiss
Date: March 09, 2018Response to Motion to Dismiss
Date: May 30, 2018Notice of Case Transfer
Date: July 22, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: October 22, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: July 13, 2018Receipt
Date: July 26, 2019Notice of Cancellation
Date: March 17, 2020Notice of Appearance
Date: March 13, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 16, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 16, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 16, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 16, 2018Motion to Amend Complaint
Date: April 19, 2018Order Granting Motion to Amend
Date: April 26, 2018Motion to Dismiss 2nd Amended Complaint
Date: May 09, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: February 05, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: February 25, 2020Motion to Compel
Date: February 24, 2020Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint
Date: April 02, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 17, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
February 25, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
February 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel Party: Plaintiff xxxxxx, xxxxxxx |
|
July 26, 2019 | Docket Event | Receipt for File | |
July 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Transfer BROWARD COUNTY COURT -CENTRAL |
|
July 22, 2019 | Docket Event | Don't Docket On This Case | |
February 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance Party: Plaintiff xxxxxx, xxxxxxx |
|
October 22, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
October 22, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
July 13, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.