Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Palen, Alexis, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Malamud, Brian H, against Darden Restaurants Inc, represented by Pryor, Nikeisha S.W., in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Haury, William W., Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 16, 2018 |
CategoryNeg - Premises Liability Commercial |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is filed by Alexis Palen against Darden Restaurants Inc. d/b/a Bahama Breeze Island Grille. The complaint alleges that on February 2, 2017, Alexis Palen slipped and fell on a greasy and slippery substance on the floor of Bahama Breeze ...
Notice of Propounding Interrogatories
Date: January 16, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: January 16, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 16, 2018Request for Production
Date: January 16, 2018Response to Request for Admissions
Date: February 08, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: February 15, 2018Request to Produce
Date: February 20, 2018Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: February 08, 2018Response to Request to Produce
Date: March 10, 2018Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: February 20, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: June 22, 2018Subpoena Issued By Attorney
Date: June 22, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: September 27, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: October 10, 2018Re-Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: November 05, 2018Stipulation for Dismissal
Date: March 19, 2019Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 16, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 16, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: January 30, 2018Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: February 20, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: February 20, 2018Privilege Log
Date: March 10, 2018Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: March 10, 2018Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories
Date: April 10, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: April 18, 2018Notice of Compliance
Date: May 04, 2018Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: June 11, 2018Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories
Date: July 26, 2018Notice of Cancellation
Date: August 08, 2018Re-Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: August 10, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: September 20, 2018Subpoena Issued By Attorney
Date: September 27, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: September 27, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Stipulation for Dismissal | |
November 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Re-Notice of Taking Deposition | |
November 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Re-Notice of Taking Deposition | |
October 10, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition | |
September 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Taking Deposition Ana Mendez 11/08/18 2:30 PMParty: Defendant Darden Restaurants Inc |
|
September 27, 2018 | Docket Event | Subpoena Issued By Attorney | |
September 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Taking Deposition Elizabeth Palen 11/08/18 1:30 PMParty: Defendant Darden Restaurants Inc |
|
September 27, 2018 | Docket Event | Subpoena Issued By Attorney | |
September 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition | |
August 10, 2018 | Docket Event | Re-Notice of Taking Deposition |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.