Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Authorized Advanced General Contractors Inc, filed a(n) Other case against Saint Louis, Jacqueson, Saint Louis, Tatiana, represented by Green, Nathaniel Edward, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Singer, Michele Towbin presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 16, 2018 |
CategoryOther |
Last RefreshedOctober 03, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
|
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
Notice of Filing
Date: February 08, 2021Motion for Attorney Fees
Date: March 08, 2021Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: April 29, 2021Notice of Hearing
Date: July 08, 2021Order
Date: July 13, 2021Agreed Order
Date: January 16, 2018Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: February 08, 2018Reply to Affirmative Defenses
Date: February 08, 2018Amended Answer
Date: February 02, 2018Response to Request for Admissions
Date: September 04, 2018Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: August 07, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: August 07, 2018Notice of Expert Witnesses
Date: April 12, 2019Request for Copies (Pursuant to Rule 1.351)
Date: April 15, 2019Notice of Mediation
Date: April 15, 2019Re-Notice of Mediation
Date: April 15, 2019Notice of Filing
Date: August 01, 2019Order Resetting
Date: June 21, 2019Request
Date: April 17, 2019Uniform Order Setting Pretrial Deadline
Date: September 05, 2020Motion to Compel
Date: July 24, 2019Mediation Report
Date: April 26, 2019Notice of Non Objection to Production
Date: April 17, 2019Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: June 30, 2021Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: April 12, 2019Order Granting Motion to Withdraw
Date: June 21, 2019Motion to Withdraw
Date: June 17, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order FOR ATTORNEYS FEES |
|
July 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
June 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Order Setting Case Management Conference | |
April 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Order Setting Case Management Conference | |
March 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion for Attorney Fees AND MOTION TO TAX COSTSParty: Defendant Saint Louis, Tatiana Defendant Saint Louis, Jacqueson |
|
February 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing | |
February 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Comment: CLERK'S MINUTES/ NON JURY |
|
February 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Exhibit List | |
February 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Defendant's Exhibits Party: Defendant Saint Louis, Tatiana |
|
January 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pre-Trial Statement Party: Defendant Saint Louis, Tatiana Defendant Saint Louis, Jacqueson |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.