Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Black, Rebbica, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Duboff, Kenneth, against Certain Underwriters At Lloyds London, represented by Cooper, Christopher R, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Fahnestock, Fabienne E. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 16, 2018 |
CategoryOther - Insurance Claim |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is a petition for declaratory relief filed by Rebbica Black against Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London. The petitioner is seeking a determination of insurance coverage and the parties' contractual rights and obligations under a pr...
eSummons Issuance
Date: January 16, 2018Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: January 16, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 16, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 16, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: January 16, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: February 09, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: March 09, 2018Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: January 16, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: February 09, 2018Agreed Order
Date: April 05, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: March 29, 2018Notice of Unavailability
Date: April 12, 2018Motion to Dismiss
Date: May 01, 2018Re-Notice of Hearing
Date: June 29, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: June 20, 2018Re-Notice of Hearing
Date: August 13, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: July 30, 2018Request for Production
Date: January 16, 2018Agreed Order
Date: March 26, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: April 16, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 16, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
August 13, 2018 | Docket Event | Re-Notice of Hearing | |
July 30, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
June 29, 2018 | Docket Event | Re-Notice of Hearing | |
June 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
May 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss Party: Defendant Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London |
|
April 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Unavailability | |
April 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Agreed Order on Motion for Extension of Time |
|
March 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time TO RESPOND PLAINTIFF'S INITIAL DISCOVERY REOUESTSParty: Defendant Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London |
|
March 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Agreed Order Motion for Extension of Time-GRANTED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.