Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Water Damage Clean Llc, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Bernstein, John Stat, against Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company, represented by Brant, Todd E, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Rodriguez, Carlos Augusto presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 16, 2018 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is filed by Water Damage Clean, LLC on behalf of Magda Cintron against Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company. The plaintiff alleges a breach of contract and seeks a declaratory judgment regarding their rights under the insura...
Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: January 16, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: January 16, 2018Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: April 02, 2018Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: January 16, 2018Request for Production
Date: January 16, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 16, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 16, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: April 02, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: January 22, 2018Motion to Compel
Date: April 30, 2018Motion to Compel
Date: April 30, 2018Order Granting Motion to Compel
Date: June 28, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: May 15, 2018Notice for/of Trial
Date: November 13, 2018Notice of Compliance
Date: June 28, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 16, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 13, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice for/of Trial | |
June 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Motion to Compel Responses to Discovery and Scheduling of Depositions |
|
June 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Compliance | |
May 15, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
April 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel SCHEDULING OF DEPOSITIONSParty: Plaintiff Water Damage Clean LLC |
|
April 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel RESPONSES TO DISCOVERYParty: Plaintiff Water Damage Clean LLC |
|
April 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Answer & Affirmative Defenses TO COMPLAINTParty: Defendant Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company |
|
April 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS. (Amended)Party: Defendant Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company |
|
January 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance Party: Defendant Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company |
|
January 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum FIELD ADJUSTERParty: Plaintiff Water Damage Clean LLC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.