Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Sg Summit Llc, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by Rubin, Steven D, against Francesann Ford Md, Beautiful Vision Pllc, represented by Kelsky, Brad, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Bowman, John B. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 16, 2018 |
CategoryRemoval Of Tenant |
Last RefreshedMarch 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 22, 2020 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Production | |
April 20, 2020 | Docket Event | Response to Request to Produce | |
April 20, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories | |
April 15, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
March 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion for Judgment on Pleadings Party: Plaintiff SG Summit LLC |
|
March 23, 2020 | Docket Event | Request to Produce | |
March 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Order Extending Time | |
March 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time DEFENDANTS/COUNTER-PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIMEParty: Defendant Beautiful Vision PLLC Defendant Francesann Ford MD |
|
March 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Agreed Order ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER/GRANTED. DEPOSITION SHALL TAKE PLACE NO LATEN THAN MARCH 2, 2020. |
|
February 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Re-Notice of Taking Deposition |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.