Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Park Plaza Realty Corp, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Stein, Eric P, against Reiss, Edward, represented by Zorrilla, Juan Carlos, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Perlman, Sandra presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 12, 2018 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is filed by Park Plaza Realty Corp. against Park City Plaza Trust for breach of contract and seeks specific performance and damages incident to specific performance. The plaintiff, Park Plaza Realty Corp., is a Florida corporation, whi...
Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 12, 2018Notice of Lis Pendens
Date: January 16, 2018Affidavit of Service
Date: February 22, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: February 28, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: March 25, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: March 25, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: March 26, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: August 10, 2018Subpoena for Deposition Returned Served
Date: April 09, 2018Subpoena for Deposition Returned Served
Date: April 09, 2018Reply to Affirmative Defenses
Date: April 17, 2018Objection to Non-Party Production
Date: April 18, 2018Request for Production of Documents
Date: June 06, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: June 06, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: July 11, 2018Order Extending Time
Date: July 13, 2018Joint Stipulation
Date: February 04, 2019Response to Request for Admissions
Date: August 10, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 12, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 12, 2018Motion for Enlargement of Time
Date: February 28, 2018Agreed Order
Date: March 06, 2018Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: March 24, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: March 26, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
Joint Stipulation OF DISMISSAL W/PREJ |
|
August 10, 2018 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Production | |
August 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
Response to Request for Admissions FIRSTParty: Defendant Reiss, Edward |
|
July 13, 2018 | Docket Event | Order Extending Time | |
July 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSIONParty: Defendant Reiss, Edward |
|
June 06, 2018 | Docket Event | Request for Production of Documents | |
June 06, 2018 | Docket Event | Request for Admissions | |
April 18, 2018 | Docket Event | Objection to Non-Party Production | |
April 18, 2018 | Docket Event | Objection to Non-Party Production | |
April 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Reply to Affirmative Defenses |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.