Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Citibank Na, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Debski, Michael Thiel, against Smith , Ena I, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Levenson, Jeffrey R. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 12, 2018 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is filed by Citibank, N.A. against the defendant, ENA I SMITH. The complaint consists of two counts: Count I - Account Stated and Count II - Unjust Enrichment. In Count I, Citibank alleges that before the institution of this action, th...
eSummons Issuance
Date: January 12, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 12, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 12, 2018Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing
Date: January 12, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: March 21, 2018Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: March 29, 2018Stipulation for-of Settlement
Date: August 16, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Stipulation for-of Settlement | |
March 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
Answer & Affirmative Defenses Party: Defendant Smith , Ena I |
|
March 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 10th day of March, 2018 at 09:49 AMParty: Defendant Smith , Ena I |
|
January 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Fee Payor: MICHAEL THIEL DEBSKI ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A006190; ;Amount: $10.00 |
|
January 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Payor: MICHAEL THIEL DEBSKI ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A006190; ;Amount: $401.00 |
|
January 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance Ena I Smith |
|
January 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet | |
January 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Complaint (eFiled) Party: Plaintiff Citibank NA |
|
January 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing | |
January 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.