Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Herzog, Lawrence, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Collier, Robert E, Ii, against City Of Deerfield Beach, Sequoia Gardens Condominium Association Inc, represented by Billaud, Keran John, Mandel, Matthew H, Tessler, Lonni D, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Rodriguez, Carlos Augusto presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 12, 2018 |
CategoryNeg - Premises Liability Commercial |
Last RefreshedOctober 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is a legal document filed by Lawrence Herzog against Sequoia Gardens Condominium Association, Inc. The plaintiff is seeking damages in excess of $15,000. Lawrence Herzog is a resident of Broward County, Florida, while the defendant is ...
Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement
Date: September 18, 2020Notice of Hearing
Date: October 02, 2020Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: October 13, 2020Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 12, 2018Request for Production of Documents
Date: January 12, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: January 30, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 12, 2018Motion for Enlargement of Time
Date: February 13, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: February 16, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 18, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: February 13, 2018Reply to Answer
Date: February 19, 2018Joint Stipulation
Date: February 19, 2018Stipulation & Order for Substitution of Counsel
Date: February 27, 2018Notice of Filing
Date: April 09, 2018Motion
Date: February 21, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: March 05, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: March 06, 2018Supplemental Response - Request for Production
Date: April 17, 2018Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: April 17, 2018Request for Copies
Date: July 12, 2018Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: April 26, 2018Order Granting Motion
Date: April 18, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: April 26, 2018Certificate of No Objection
Date: July 12, 2018Request for Production of Documents
Date: August 14, 2018Amended Complaint
Date: August 14, 2018Agreed Order Granting
Date: August 13, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: September 10, 2018Subpoena Returned Served
Date: November 08, 2018Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement
Date: November 26, 2018Subpoena Returned Served
Date: November 27, 2018Notice of Compliance
Date: January 24, 2019Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement
Date: March 21, 2019Notice of Cancellation
Date: November 27, 2018Notice of Unavailability
Date: April 29, 2019Notice of Filing Affidavit
Date: July 15, 2019Certificate of No Objection
Date: January 24, 2019Notice of Compliance
Date: March 08, 2019Request for Copies
Date: January 23, 2019Request for Copies
Date: January 17, 2019Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing
Date: July 15, 2019Motion for Summary Final Judgment
Date: July 15, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: July 23, 2019Amended Notice of Hearing
Date: December 03, 2019Motion for Sanctions
Date: May 22, 2020Amended Response to Request for Production
Date: June 02, 2020Supplemental Request to Produce
Date: February 02, 2021Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: July 27, 2020Notice of Cancellation
Date: November 17, 2020Notice of Hearing
Date: February 09, 2021Certificate
Date: March 18, 2021Notice of Compliance
Date: December 02, 2020Order to Show Cause
Date: November 19, 2020Notice of Mediation
Date: January 06, 2021Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: December 07, 2020Motion
Date: February 09, 2021Re-Notice of Mediation
Date: February 09, 2021Response to Request for Production
Date: March 04, 2021Certificate
Date: March 19, 2021Notice of Unavailability
Date: July 26, 2021Response to Request for Production
Date: March 14, 2022Case Management Order
Date: October 27, 2021Response to Request to Produce
Date: August 30, 2021Supplemental Request to Produce
Date: January 25, 2022Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories
Date: August 30, 2021Calendar Call-Order Setting Trial
Date: December 14, 2021Notice
Date: January 21, 2022Order Referring Case to Mediation
Date: January 04, 2022Notice
Date: February 23, 2022Request for Admissions
Date: March 13, 2022Motion to Compel Discovery
Date: March 14, 2022Request for Production
Date: March 13, 2022Ex Parte Order to Compel
Date: March 15, 2022Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: January 12, 2018eSummons Not Issued - Atty advised
Date: January 12, 2018Request for Production
Date: February 21, 2018Interrogatories & Notice of Service
Date: February 21, 2018Interrogatories & Notice of Filing
Date: February 21, 2018Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: March 05, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: March 15, 2018Response to Request to Produce
Date: April 09, 2018Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories
Date: April 09, 2018Notice of Filing
Date: April 17, 2018Motion for Leave to Amend
Date: July 27, 2018Notice of Filing Interrogs
Date: August 14, 2018eSummons Issuance - On Amended
Date: August 21, 2018Summons on Amended Complaint Returned Served
Date: August 28, 2018Reply to Affirmative Defenses
Date: September 11, 2018Answer to Amended Complaint
Date: September 11, 2018Reply to Answer
Date: September 11, 2018Not of Intent to Serve Subpoenas Under Rule 1.351
Date: September 24, 2018Request for Copies
Date: October 01, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: October 09, 2018Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: October 09, 2018Not of Intent to Serve Subpoenas Under Rule 1.351
Date: October 22, 2018Request for Copies
Date: October 23, 2018Cross Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: January 02, 2019Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: January 11, 2019Notice of Filing Affidavit
Date: November 19, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: November 20, 2019Motion for Continuance
Date: November 20, 2019Agreed Order
Date: December 03, 2019Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: December 03, 2019Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: December 06, 2019Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: December 11, 2019Cross Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: December 30, 2019Cross Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: December 30, 2019Cross Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: January 09, 2020Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: January 09, 2020Motion to Compel Discovery
Date: January 28, 2020Motion to Compel
Date: January 31, 2020Request for Production of Documents
Date: February 27, 2020Notice of Hearing
Date: January 31, 2020Motion for Leave to Amend
Date: February 03, 2020Notice of Hearing
Date: February 04, 2020Agreed Order
Date: February 18, 2020Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: February 27, 2020Order
Date: February 27, 2020Second Amended Complaint
Date: February 27, 2020Notice of Hearing
Date: February 28, 2020eSummons Issuance
Date: February 27, 2020Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: March 18, 2020Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: March 18, 2020Summons Returned Served
Date: March 18, 2020Order on Motion to Compel
Date: March 18, 2020Reply to Answer
Date: March 19, 2020Motion for Extension of Time
Date: April 07, 2020Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: April 13, 2020Reply to Affirmative Defenses
Date: April 14, 2020Ex Parte Motion
Date: May 22, 2020Response to Request for Production
Date: June 02, 2020Motion for Order to Show Cause
Date: September 18, 2020Motion
Date: September 28, 2020Order Referring Case to Mediation
Date: November 24, 2020Order Granting Motion
Date: February 17, 2021Notice of Interrogatories
Date: July 30, 2021Request to Produce
Date: July 30, 2021Notice of Appearance
Date: September 21, 2021Mediation Report
Date: March 23, 2021Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: June 02, 2020Request for Copies
Date: April 17, 2018Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: July 11, 2018Answer to Amended Complaint
Date: September 10, 2018Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: February 16, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: July 27, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: October 09, 2018Notice of Compliance
Date: September 12, 2018Certificate of No Objection
Date: October 10, 2018Certificate of No Objection
Date: November 07, 2018Re-Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: November 28, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: November 21, 2019Ex Parte Order to Compel
Date: May 23, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Order to Compel DISCOVERY |
|
March 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Production | |
March 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel Discovery EX PARTE MOTIONParty: Plaintiff Herzog, Lawrence |
|
March 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Request for Admissions | |
March 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Request for Production | |
February 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice June 9,2022 |
|
January 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Supplemental Request to Produce | |
January 21, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF NON-BINDING ARBITRATION; APRIL 29, 2022 AT 2:30PM VIA CONFERENCE | |
January 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Order Referring Case to Mediation | |
December 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Calendar Call-Order Setting Trial |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.